EP0790355 - EXCAVATION REGION SETTING APPARATUS FOR CONTROLLING REGION LIMITED EXCAVATION BY CONSTRUCTION MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.2007 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Construction Machinery Co., Ltd. 5-1, Koraku 2-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 112-0004 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/33] | For all designated states HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY CO., LTD. 5-1, Koraku 2-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 112-0004 / JP | ||
Former [1997/34] | For all designated states HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY CO., LTD. 6-2, Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WATANABE, Hiroshi 1082-66, Tagucho Ushiku-shi Ibaraki 300-12 / JP | 02 /
HIRATA, Toichi 13-5, Sakaecho 4-chome Ushiku-shi Ibaraki 300-12 / JP | 03 /
HAGA, Masakazu 9-8, Inayoshihigashi 5-chome Chiyodamachi Niihari-gun Ibaraki 315 / JP | 04 /
FUJISHIMA, Kazuo Tsukuba-ryo 4-1, Inayoshiminami 2-chome Chiyodamachi Niihari-gun Ibaraki 315 / JP | [1997/34] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/34] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96926605.5 | 08.08.1996 | [1997/34] | WO1996JP02251 | Priority number, date | JP19950207023 | 14.08.1995 Original published format: JP 20702395 | [1997/34] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9707296 | Date: | 27.02.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0790355 | Date: | 20.08.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.02.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0790355 | Date: | 30.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.02.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | E02F3/43 | [1997/34] | CPC: |
E02F3/32 (EP);
E02F3/437 (EP);
E02F9/20 (KR);
E02F9/2285 (EP);
E02F9/2296 (EP);
E02F9/26 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1997/34] | Title | German: | BAGGERBEREICH-FESTLEGUNGSGERÄT ZUR STEUERUNG DER ARBEITSBEREICHSBEGRENZUNG DES BAGGERNS FÜR EINE BAUMASCHINE | [1997/34] | English: | EXCAVATION REGION SETTING APPARATUS FOR CONTROLLING REGION LIMITED EXCAVATION BY CONSTRUCTION MACHINE | [1997/34] | French: | APPAREIL DE DEFINITION D'UNE ZONE A EXCAVER PERMETTANT DE CONTROLER L'EXCAVATION D'UNE ZONE LIMITEE PAR UNE MACHINE DE CONSTRUCTION | [1997/34] | Entry into regional phase | 20.01.1997 | Translation filed | 02.05.1997 | National basic fee paid | 02.05.1997 | Search fee paid | 02.05.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.05.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.05.1997 | Examination requested [1997/34] | 16.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 17.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]US4829418 (NIELSEN EDWARD G [US], et al) [YD] 1-6 * abstract * * column 2, line 32 - column 3, line 3 * * column 7, line 67 - column 8, line 48 * * column 12, line 38 - line 59 * * column 14, line 63 - column 15, line 13 * * column 17, line 60 - column 18, line 20 * * figures 1,3,7B,10 *; | [Y]GB2272204 (KUBOTA KK [JP]) [Y] 1-6 * abstract * * figures 3,6 * * page 14, line 10 - page 16, line 15 * * claim 1 *; | [PX]EP0707118 (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY [JP]) [PX] 1-6 * abstract * * page 3, line 13 - line 31 * * page 3, line 50 - page 4, line 2 * * page 8, line 17 - line 24 * * claims 1-31 * * figures 4,5,11,15 *; | [E]EP0735202 (LASER ALIGNMENT [US]) [E] 1-6 * abstract * * claims 5-13 * * column 2, line 8 - line 50 * * column 3, line 37 - column 4, line 40 * * column 8, line 20 - column 9, line 10 * * column 9, line 51 - column 10, line 11 * * figures 3,4,7 *; | [A]WO9323628 (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-3,5,6; | US5490081 [ ] (KUROMOTO KAZUNORI [JP], et al) [ ] * abstract * * column 2, line 38 - line 67 * * column 4, line 44 - column 5, line 54 * * claims 1,2 * * figures 4,5 * | International search | [A]JPH04136324 (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD); | [A]JPS63219731 (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY) |