EP0843833 - CONTROL OF DISPERSION IN AN OPTICAL WAVEGUIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LI | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corning Incorporated 1 Riverfront Plaza Corning, NY 14831 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/22] | For all designated states CORNING INCORPORATED 1 Riverfront Plaza Corning, N.Y. 14831 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANTOS, Alfred, J. 1589 Vanderhoff Road Elmira, NY 14903 / US | 02 /
BHAGAVATULA, Venkata, A. 29 Orchard Drive Big Flats, NY 14814 / US | 03 /
CHOWDHURY, Dipakbin, Q. 14 Emily Drive Corning, NY 14830 / US | 04 /
NOLAN, Daniel, A. 28 Skyline Drive Corning, NY 14830 / US | [1998/22] | Representative(s) | Boon, Graham Anthony Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/22] | Boon, Graham Anthony Elkington and Fife, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 96926753.3 | 22.07.1996 | [1998/22] | WO1996US12082 | Priority number, date | US19950513654 | 10.08.1995 Original published format: US 513654 | [1998/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9706457 | Date: | 20.02.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0843833 | Date: | 27.05.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.02.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0843833 | Date: | 12.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.02.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/17, C03B37/02, G02B6/16, G02B6/10, C03B37/027 | [1998/44] | CPC: |
C03B37/01205 (EP,KR,US);
G02B6/02066 (EP,KR,US);
G02B6/02247 (EP,KR,US);
G02B6/02285 (EP,KR,US);
G02B6/105 (EP,KR,US);
C03B2203/18 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [1998/22] | G02B6/17, C03B37/02 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1998/22] | Title | German: | DISPERSIONSREGELUNG IN EINEM OPTISCHEN WELLENLEITER | [1998/22] | English: | CONTROL OF DISPERSION IN AN OPTICAL WAVEGUIDE | [1998/22] | French: | REGULATION DE DISPERSION DANS UN GUIDE D'ONDES OPTIQUE | [1998/22] | Entry into regional phase | 19.11.1997 | National basic fee paid | 19.11.1997 | Search fee paid | 19.11.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.11.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.12.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 19.11.1997 | Examination requested [1998/22] | 25.08.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.02.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 25.04.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.06.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 12.09.2001 | LI | 12.09.2001 | DK | 12.12.2001 | [2015/21] |
Former [2003/46] | DK | 12.12.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5418881 (HART JR ARTHUR C [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * column 2, line 45 - line 56 * * column 3, line 16 - line 41 *; | [E]EP0737873 (CORNING INC [US]) [E] 1-18 * column 2, line 58 - column 4, line 13; figure 1 *; | [PA]US5452394 (HUANG HUNG-CHIA [CN]) [PA] 6-9,17 * column 5, line 16 - line 65; figure 1 * | International search | [A]US4163601 (OLSHANSKY ROBERT [US]); | [A]US4715679 (BHAGAVATULA VENKATA A [US]); | [A]US5329607 (KAMIKAWA NEIL T [US], et al); | [AP]US5483612 (GALLAGHER DANIEL [US], et al) |