EP0844860 - PLASTICS TAPES AND A SANITARY ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.03.2001 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.03.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.04.2001 [2001/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/23] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PALUMBO, Gianfranco Georgenfeld 7 D-61352 Bad Homburg / DE | 02 /
CORZANI, Italo Via Fontevecchia, 40 I-66100 Chieti / IT | [1998/23] | Representative(s) | Hirsch, Uwe T., et al Procter & Gamble Service GmbH IP Department Frankfurter Strasse 145 61476 Kronberg im Taunus / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/23] | Hirsch, Uwe Thomas, et al Procter & Gamble European Service GmbH, Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | Application number, filing date | 96927413.3 | 13.08.1996 | [1998/23] | WO1996US13144 | Priority number, date | EP19950830364 | 14.08.1995 Original published format: EP 95830364 | [1998/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9706764 | Date: | 27.02.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0844860 | Date: | 03.06.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.02.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.02.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/15, A61F13/58, C09J7/02 | [1998/44] | CPC: |
A61F13/58 (EP,KR);
C09J7/243 (EP);
C09J2423/006 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1998/23] | A61F13/15 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1998/27] |
Former [1998/23] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, PT, SE | Title | German: | PLASTIKBAND UND HYGIENISCHER ARTIKEL | [1998/23] | English: | PLASTICS TAPES AND A SANITARY ARTICLE | [1998/23] | French: | BANDES EN PLASTIQUE ET ARTICLE HYGIENIQUE | [1998/23] | Entry into regional phase | 28.01.1998 | National basic fee paid | 28.01.1998 | Search fee paid | 28.01.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.01.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.02.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 29.01.1998 | Examination requested [1998/23] | 17.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/16] | 08.11.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2001/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3335021 (MORGAN BURTON D) [X] 1-8,13,14,18 * column 1, line 51 - line 67 * * column 2, line 18 - line 27 * * column 2, line 45 - line 62; figure 2 * | International search | [X]US5312387 (ROSSINI STEVEN J [US], et al); | [A]US3931666 (KARAMI HAMZEH); | [A]US4237889 (GOBRAN RAMSIS [US]); | [A]US5133706 (DIXON ROBERT [US]) |