EP0851976 - PINTLE-TYPE EGR VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 22.02.2002 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2002 | Opposition rejected | published on 10.04.2002 [2002/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS CANADA LIMITED 2185 Derry Road West Mississauga Ontario L5N 7A6 / CA | For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/28] | For all designated states SIEMENS CANADA LIMITED 2185 Derry Road West Mississauga, Ontario L5N 7A6 / CA | ||
For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Minamiaoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HRYTZAK, Bernard, J. 5 Eastlawn Drive Chatham, Ontario N7M 5J4 / CA | 02 /
GOMI, Takeshi 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama / JP | 03 /
NEMOTO, Hirotomi 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama / JP | 04 /
YAMAMOTO, Yoshio 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama / JP | [1998/28] | Representative(s) | Allen, Derek Siemens Group Services Limited Intellectual Property Department Siemens House Oldbury, Bracknell Berkshire RG12 8FZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/28] | Allen, Derek Siemens Group Services Limited, Intellectual Property Department, Siemens House, Oldbury Bracknell, Berkshire RG12 8FZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 96927470.3 | 21.08.1996 | [1998/28] | WO1996CA00559 | Priority number, date | US19950520540 | 29.08.1995 Original published format: US 520540 | [1998/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9708444 | Date: | 06.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0851976 | Date: | 08.07.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0851976 | Date: | 26.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.03.1997 | Classification | IPC: | F02M25/07 | [1998/28] | CPC: |
F02M26/48 (EP,US);
F02M26/53 (EP,US);
F02M26/67 (EP,US);
F02M26/72 (EP,US);
F02M26/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1998/28] | Title | German: | ABGASRÜCKFÜHRVENTIL MIT VENTILSCHAFT | [1998/28] | English: | PINTLE-TYPE EGR VALVE | [1998/28] | French: | SOUPAPE DE RECIRCULATION DES GAZ D'ECHAPPEMENT DU TYPE A AIGUILLE | [1998/28] | Entry into regional phase | 16.01.1998 | National basic fee paid | 16.01.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.01.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.03.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.01.1998 | Examination requested [1998/28] | 01.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.07.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
07.10.2000
03.11.2000
ADMISSIBLE Gustav Wahler GmbH u. Co. KG Hindenburgstr. 146 73730 Esslingen / DE Opponent's representative Kratzsch, Volkhard Postfach 10 01 62 73701 Esslingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/35] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
07.10.2000
03.11.2000
ADMISSIBLE Gustav Wahler GmbH u. Co. KG Hindenburgstr. 146 73730 Esslingen / DE Opponent's representative Kratzsch, Volkhard, Dipl.-Ing. Postfach 10 01 62 73701 Esslingen / DE | ||
Former [2000/52] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
07.10.2000
03.11.2000
ADMISSIBLE Gustav Wahler GmbH u. Co. KG Hindenburgstr. 146 73730 Esslingen / DE Opponent's representative Kratzsch, Volkhard, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt, Mülbergerstrasse 65 73728 Esslingen / DE | 01.12.2000 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 07.03.2001 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 02.11.2001 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 12.11.2001 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2002/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US3927650 (SMITH CLAUDE A, et al) [X] 1 * column 4, line 9 - line 21; figure 3 * * column 6, line 21 - line 30 * * column 7, line 26 - line 68 * [Y] 8,9,11; | [A]US4056084 (BAUMGARTNER HANS) [A] 8 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US4312319 (BRAKEBILL HAROLD G) [A] 1 * column 3, line 17 - line 25; figure 1 *; | [A]US4351285 (BRADSHAW CYRIL E) [A] 1 * column 4, line 13 - line 19; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]WO8807625 (ROBERTSHAW CONTROLS CO [US]) [Y] 8,9,11 * figures 2,3 *; | [A]US5027781 (LEWIS CALVIN C [US]); | [A]DE29506928U (PIERBURG GMBH [DE]) [A] 8* figure 1 *; | [A]US5435519 (EVERINGHAM GARY M [CA]) [A] 1,11 * column 1, line 43 - line 60 * * column 2, line 3 - line 5 * * column 2, line 16 - line 19 * * column 3, line 9 - line 14; figure 1 * |