EP0843925 - WAVEFORM MONITORING AND RESTITUTION METHOD AND DEVICE FOR IMPLEMENTING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.01.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.03.2002 [2002/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF SEXTANT Aérodrome de Villacoublay, Zone Aéronautique Louis Bréguet 78141 Vélizy Villacoublay / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/44] | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF SEXTANT Aérodrome de Villacoublay, Zone Aéronautique Louis Bréguet 78141 Vélizy Villacoublay / FR | ||
Former [1998/22] | For all designated states SEXTANT AVIONIQUE Aérodrome de Villacoublay 78141 Velizy Villacoublay / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LE BORGNE, Olivier THOMSON-CSF TPI/PC 13, Avenue du Président Salvador Allende 94117 ARCUEIL CEDEX / FR | 02 /
TOILLON, Patrice Thomson-CSF SCPI Boîte postale 329 F-92402 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | [1998/32] |
Former [1998/22] | 01 /
LE BORGNE, Olivier Thomson-CSF SCPI Boîte postale 329 F-92402 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | ||
02 /
TOILLON, Patrice Thomson-CSF SCPI Boîte postale 329 F-92402 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | Representative(s) | Chaverneff, Vladimir, et al Marks & Clerk France Conseils en Propriété Industrielle Immeuble " Visium " 22, avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/22] | Chaverneff, Vladimir, et al THOMSON-CSF-S.C.P.I., 13, Avenue du Président Salvador Allende 94117 Arcueil Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 96927740.9 | 02.08.1996 | [1998/22] | WO1996FR01241 | Priority number, date | FR19950009763 | 11.08.1995 Original published format: FR 9509763 | [1998/22] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9707610 | Date: | 27.02.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0843925 | Date: | 27.05.1998 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.02.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.02.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/20 | [1998/22] | CPC: |
H04L1/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1998/22] | Title | German: | WELLENFORMÜBERWACHUNGS- UND -WIEDERHERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN SOWIE VORRICHTUNG ZU DEREN VERWENDUNG | [1998/22] | English: | WAVEFORM MONITORING AND RESTITUTION METHOD AND DEVICE FOR IMPLEMENTING SAME | [1998/22] | French: | PROCEDE DE SURVEILLANCE ET DE RESTITUTION DE FORMES D'ONDES, ET DISPOSITIF DE MISE EN OEUVRE | [1998/22] | Entry into regional phase | 02.02.1998 | National basic fee paid | 02.02.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.02.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.02.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.02.1998 | Examination requested [1998/22] | 23.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/11] | 10.10.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2001 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3721959 (GEORGE) [A] 1-8 * column A; figures 2-4 * * column 2, line 31 - line 42 *; | [A]DE1804719 (SIEMENS) [A] 1-8 * figure 2 * * column 1, line 48 - line 61 * * column 2, line 26 - line 41 *; | [A]DE2320457 (LICENTIA GMBH) [A] 1-8 * figures 1,2 * * page 3, line 10 - line 20 *; | [A]EP0087738 (INTERNATIONAL STANDARD ELECTRIC) [A] 1-8 * column A; figures 3,4 * | [X] - MILLER, "High-speed digital transmitter characterization using eye diagram analysis", HEWLETT-PACKARD JOURNAL, PALO ALTO, US, (199408), vol. 45, no. 4, pages 29 - 37, XP002001689 [X] 1-8 * figure 3 * * page 32, column R, paragraph 1 - page 33, column R, paragraph 1 * * page 35, column R, paragraph 3 - page 36, column L, paragraph 1 * * page 36, column L, paragraph 4 - column R, paragraph 1 * |