EP0845022 - REFRIGERANT COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 15.02.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2002 | Refusal of application | published on 03.04.2002 [2002/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES PLC Imperial Chemical House, 9 Millbank London SW1P 3JF / GB | [1998/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POWELL, Richard, Llewellyn 9 Sadler's Wells Bunbury Tarporley Cheshire CW6 9NV / GB | 02 /
CORR, Stuart 31 Foxhills Close Appleton Warrington Cheshire WA4 5DH / GB | 03 /
MURPHY, Frederick, Thomas 53 Fairways Frodsham Cheshire WA6 7RY / GB | 04 /
MORRISON, James, David 39 Sandown Crescent Cuddington Northwich Cheshire CW8 2QN / GB | [1998/23] | Representative(s) | Dee, Ian Mark, et al Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/18] | Dee, Ian Mark, et al Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | ||
Former [1998/23] | Thomas, Ieuan, et al Intellectual Property Department ICI Chemicals & Polymers Ltd P.O. Box 11 The Heath Runcorn Cheshire WA7 4QE / GB | Application number, filing date | 96927758.1 | 12.08.1996 | [1998/23] | WO1996GB01961 | Priority number, date | GB19950016909 | 18.08.1995 Original published format: GB 9516909 | [1998/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9707182 | Date: | 27.02.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0845022 | Date: | 03.06.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.02.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.02.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C09K5/04 | [1998/23] | CPC: |
C09K5/045 (EP,US);
C09K2205/106 (EP,US);
C09K2205/122 (EP,US);
C09K2205/34 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/23] | Title | German: | KÜHLMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [1998/23] | English: | REFRIGERANT COMPOSITIONS | [1998/23] | French: | COMPOSITIONS REFRIGERANTES | [1998/23] | Entry into regional phase | 23.01.1998 | National basic fee paid | 23.01.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.01.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.02.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.01.1998 | Examination requested [1998/23] | 23.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.04.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 30.08.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2002/14] | 09.09.2001 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2002/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2001 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4943388 (SHANKLAND IAN R [US], et al) [A] 1,9,10* the whole document *; | [A]DE4116274 (FORSCHUNGSZENTRUM FUER KAELTET [DE]) [A] 1,9,10 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0638623 (AUSIMONT SPA [IT]) [A] 1,5-12 * page 2, line 53 - page 3, line 11 * * example 11 * |