EP0847234 - ROTARY AGRICULTURAL COMBINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.04.2002 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.06.2002 [2002/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/04] | For all designated states DEERE & COMPANY One John Deere Place Moline, Illinois 61265-8098 / US | ||
Former [1998/25] | For all designated states DEERE & COMPANY John Deere Road Moline Illinois 61265-8098 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PFEIFFER, Dohn, William 3530 - 56th street Court Moline, IL 61265 / US | 02 /
BRAUNHARDT, Klaus, Adam Schwarzwaldstrasse 15 D-66482 Zweibrücken / DE | 03 /
SKINNER, David, Alden 3410 - 76th Street Moline, IL 61265 / US | 04 /
HARDEN, Philip, Alan 421 Wilshire Drive Colona, IL 61241 / US | [1998/25] | Representative(s) | Magin, Ludwig Bernhard, et al John Deere GmbH & Co. KG Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Strasse 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/39] | Magin, Ludwig Bernhard, et al Deere & Company European Office Patent Department 68140 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [1998/25] | Feldmann, Bernhard, et al DEERE & COMPANY European Office Patent Department Steubenstrasse 36-42 68163 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 96928422.3 | 07.08.1996 | [1998/25] | WO1996EP03487 | Priority number, date | US19950520277 | 28.08.1995 Original published format: US 520277 | [1998/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9707660 | Date: | 06.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0847234 | Date: | 17.06.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0847234 | Date: | 13.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.03.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A01F7/06 | [1998/25] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT [1998/25] | Title | German: | AXIALFLUSSMÄHDRESCHER | [1998/25] | English: | ROTARY AGRICULTURAL COMBINE | [1998/25] | French: | MOISSONNEUSE-BATTEUSE ROTATIVE | [1998/25] | Entry into regional phase | 29.01.1998 | National basic fee paid | 29.01.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.01.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.01.1998 | Examination requested [1998/25] | 11.06.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.11.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.12.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.03.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2019708 (DEERE & CO); | [A]GB2053644 (WITZEL H D); | [A]WO8901735 (GOL SP K BJURO [SU]); | [AX]EP0631716 (DEERE & CO [US]) [A] 1,2,5,6 * column W * [X] 4,7 |