EP0843727 - RESISTANCE AGAINST WILT INDUCING FUNGI [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.07.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.09.2003 [2003/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KEYGENE N.V. Agro Business Park 90, P.O. Box 216 6700 AE Wageningen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1998/22] | For all designated states KEYGENE N.V. Agrobusiness Park 90, P.O. Box 216 6700 AE Wageningen / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZABEAU, Marc Erpelsteeg 70 B-9000 Gent / BE | 02 /
VOS, Pieter Dorpsstraat 22 NL-3927 BD Renswoude / NL | 03 /
SIMONS, Guus Zoetendaal 11 NL-6715 JL Ede / NL | 04 /
GROENENDIJK, John Wilhelminaweg 2-B 6703 AT Wageningen / NL | [1998/22] | Representative(s) | Desaix, Anne, et al Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/22] | Desaix, Anne, et al Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A. 3, rue Chauveau-Lagarde 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 96929215.0 | 06.08.1996 | [1998/22] | WO1996EP03480 | Priority number, date | EP19950401849 | 07.08.1995 Original published format: EP 95401849 | [1998/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9706259 | Date: | 20.02.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0843727 | Date: | 27.05.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.02.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.05.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/29, C12N15/82, C12Q1/68 | [1998/22] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6895 (EP);
C07K14/415 (EP);
C12N15/8279 (EP);
C12N15/8282 (EP);
C12Q2600/156 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/22] | Title | German: | RESISTENZ GEGEN WELK-INDUZIERENDE PILZE | [1998/22] | English: | RESISTANCE AGAINST WILT INDUCING FUNGI | [1998/22] | French: | RESISTANCE AUX CHAMPIGNONS PROVOQUANT LA FLETRISSURE | [1998/22] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 03.02.1998 | National basic fee paid | 03.02.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.02.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.02.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.02.1998 | Examination requested [1998/22] | 03.03.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/37] | 04.04.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2002 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0252737 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [X] 32-35 * page 13, line 1 - line 2 *; | [X]WO9203567 (UNIV TENNESSEE RES CORP [US]) [X] 32-35 * page 12; table II *; | [A]EP0534858 (KEYGENE NV [NL]) [A] 30-43 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9505731 (CORNELL RES FOUNDATION INC [US]) [A] 1-43 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO9518230 (GATSBY CHARITABLE FOUNDATION [GB], et al) [Y] 10-43 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO9528423 (GEN HOSPITAL CORP [US], et al) [PX] 1,4,9,10,16,17,28,32 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO9528478 (GEN HOSPITAL CORP [US], et al) [PX] 1,4,9,10,16,17,28 * the whole document *; | [E]WO9632007 (YEDA RES & DEV [IL], et al) [E] 1-6,9,10,12,15-18,22,28,41,43* the whole document *; | [OXY] - DE WIT P.J.G.M., "Cold Spring Harbor conference on 'Molecular biology of disease resistance genes in plants'", MOLECULAR BREEDING, vol. 1, pages 203 - 206, XP002006909 [OX] 1-7,9 * page 203, column R * [Y] 10-43 | [ ] - "Disclosure by Pieter Vos at Cold Spring Harbor conference held at the Banbury Center, Cold Spring Harbor Laboratory, April 9-12, 1995", COLD SPRING HARBOR CONFERENCE | [XY] - MINDRINOS, M., ET AL., "The A. thaliana disease resistance gene RPS2 encodes a protein containing a nucleotide-binding dite and leucine-rich repeats", CELL, (19940923), vol. 78, pages 1089 - 1099, XP002028747 [X] 1,4,9,10,16,17,28 * the whole document * [Y] 1-4 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0092-8674(94)90282-8 | [Y] - ORI N., ET AL., "A genomic search for the gene conferring resistance to fusarium wilt in tomato", EUPHYTICA 79 (3). 1994. 201-204., XP000560824 [Y] 1-4 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00022520 | [A] - STASKAWICZ, B.J., ET AL., "Molecular genetics of plant disease resistance", SCIENCE, (19950505), vol. 268, page 661667, XP002028748 [A] 1-43 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.7732374 |