EP0846307 - CHIP CARD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.08.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For:AT
CH
DE
ES
FR
GB
IT
LI
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | For:AT
Philips Semiconductors Gratkorn GmbH Mikron Weg 1 8101 Gratkorn / AT | For:DE
FR
GB
IT
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | For:AT
CH
DE
ES
FR
GB
IT
LI
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
For:AT
Philips Semiconductors Gratkorn GmbH Mikron Weg 1 8101 Gratkorn / AT | |||
For:DE
FR
GB
IT
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [1999/43] | For:AT
CH
DE
ES
FR
GB
IT
LI
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
For:AT
Philips Semiconductors Gratkorn GmbH Mikron Weg 1 8101 Gratkorn / AT | |||
For:DE
FR
GB
IT
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [1998/24] | For:AT
CH
DE
ES
FR
GB
IT
LI
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
For:AT
Philips Semiconductors Gratkorn GmbH Mikron Weg 1 8101 Gratkorn / AT | |||
For:DE
FR
GB
IT
PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERGER, Dominik Radegunderstrasse 16 A-8045 Graz / AT | 02 /
EBER, Wolfgang Ragnitztalweg 148/4 A-8047 Graz / AT | 03 /
HOLWEG, Gerald Radegunderstrasse 16 A-8045 Graz / AT | 04 /
FIBRANZ, Heiko Habacherstrasse 67 D-81377 München / DE | 05 /
REINER, Robert Säulenstrasse 2 D-82008 Unterhaching / DE | 06 /
SCHRAUD, Gerhard Johann-Lipp-Strasse 62 D-86415 Mering / DE | 07 /
STRUBEL, Walter Reiswiese 12 D-82229 Seefeld / DE | 08 /
WEITZEL, Joachim Klosterring 29 D-85229 Markt Indersdorf / DE | [1998/24] | Representative(s) | Zedlitz, Peter OSRAM GmbH Intellectual Property IP Postfach 22 13 17 80503 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/17] | Zedlitz, Peter Patentanwalt, Postfach 22 13 17 80503 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/24] | Epping, Wilhelm, Dr.-Ing. Patentanwalt Postfach 22 13 17 80503 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96929324.0 | 23.08.1996 | [1998/24] | WO1996EP03745 | Priority number, date | DE1995131372 | 25.08.1995 Original published format: DE 19531372 | [1998/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9708651 | Date: | 06.03.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0846307 | Date: | 10.06.1998 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0846307 | Date: | 27.10.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.03.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/07, G06K7/00 | [1998/24] | CPC: |
G06K19/07769 (EP,US);
G06K19/07 (EP,KR,US);
G06K19/0701 (EP,US);
G06K19/0723 (EP,US);
G06K7/0008 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1998/24] | Title | German: | CHIPKARTE | [1998/24] | English: | CHIP CARD | [1998/24] | French: | CARTE A PUCE | [1998/24] | Entry into regional phase | 20.02.1998 | National basic fee paid | 20.02.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.02.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.02.1998 | Examination requested [1998/24] | 17.07.1998 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 29.07.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.1998 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 13.10.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.02.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.05.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 05.05.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP98119306.3 / EP0893781 | Opposition(s) | 28.07.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0296414 (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1,3 * claim 1 *; | [A]EP0491639 (TELECOM SYSTEMES MOBILES SA [FR]) [A] 1* claim 1 *; | [Y]EP0534559 (NEDAP NV [NL]) [Y] 1,3 * claim 1 * | Examination | DE3935364 |