EP0855079 - SELF-FOCUSING METHOD FOR SYNTHETIC ANTENNA SONARS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.04.2001 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.04.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.05.2001 [2001/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF 173, Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [1998/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BILLON, Didier Thomson-CSF SCPI 13, avenue du Président Salvador Allende F-94117 Arcueil Cédex / FR | [1998/31] | Representative(s) | Desperrier, Jean-Louis Thomson-CSF Propriété Intellectuelle, 13, Avenue du Président Salvador Allende 94117 Arcueil Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/31] | Desperrier, Jean-Louis THOMSON-CSF-S.C.P.I., 13, Avenue du Président Salvador Allende 94117 Arcueil Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 96929350.5 | 20.08.1996 | [1998/31] | WO1996FR01298 | Priority number, date | FR19950010953 | 19.09.1995 Original published format: FR 9510953 | [1998/31] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9711452 | Date: | 27.03.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0855079 | Date: | 29.07.1998 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.03.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0855079 | Date: | 07.06.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.03.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G10K11/34, G01S15/89 | [1998/31] | CPC: |
G10K11/343 (EP,US);
G01S15/8904 (EP,US);
G01S7/52003 (EP,US);
G01S7/52004 (EP,US);
G01S15/87 (EP,US);
G01S15/89 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, GB [1998/31] | Title | German: | SELBSTFOKUSSIERENDES VERFAHREN FÜR SYNTHETISCHE SONARANTENNE | [1998/31] | English: | SELF-FOCUSING METHOD FOR SYNTHETIC ANTENNA SONARS | [1998/31] | French: | PROCEDE D'AUTOFOCALISATION POUR SONAR A ANTENNE SYNTHETIQUE | [1998/31] | Entry into regional phase | 23.02.1998 | National basic fee paid | 23.02.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.02.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.02.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.02.1998 | Examination requested [1998/31] | 20.09.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.11.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.12.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 16.12.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]US5295118 (GILMOUR GEORGE A [US]) [AD] 1 * abstract *; | [A]JPH04125487 ; | [A]US4953143 (HIGGINS FRANCIS J [US], et al); | [A]DE3413074 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920818), vol. 016, no. 386, Database accession no. (P - 1404), & JP04125487 A 19920424 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [AD] - SHERIFF R W, "SYNTHETIC APERTURE BEAMFORMING WITH AUTOMATIC PHASE COMPENSATION FOR HIGII FREQUENCY SONARS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SYMPOSIUM ON AUTONOMOUS UNDERWATER VEHICLE TECHNOLOGY, WASHINGTON, JUNE 2 - 3, 1992, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19920602), no. -, pages 236 - 245, XP000344382 [AD] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/AUV.1992.225217 | [A] - DOUGLAS B L ET AL, "SYNTHETIC-APERTURE SONAR IMAGING WITH A MULTIPLE-ELEMENT RECEIVER ARRAY", IMAGE AND MULTIDIMENSIONAL SIGNAL PROCESSING, MINNEAPOLIS, APR. 27 - 30, 1993, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19930427), vol. 5 OF 5, pages 445 - 448, XP000437705 [A] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICASSP.1993.319843 |