EP0807342 - DAB RECEIVER, APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR A FORMAT CONVERSION OF A DAB DATA SEQUENCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.03.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [2008/39] |
Former [2005/17] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1997/47] | For all designated states PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPIERO, Richard, Cees Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1997/47] | Representative(s) | Groenendaal, Antonius W. M., et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1999/01] | Groenendaal, Antonius Wilhelmus Maria, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1997/47] | Schoonheijm, Harry Barend, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof.Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 96929500.5 | 25.09.1996 | [1997/47] | WO1996IB00994 | Priority number, date | EP19950202664 | 04.10.1995 Original published format: EP 95202664 | [1997/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9713339 | Date: | 10.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0807342 | Date: | 19.11.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.04.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0807342 | Date: | 27.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 10.04.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H04H1/00 | [1997/47] | CPC: |
H04H40/27 (EP,US);
H04H2201/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1997/47] | Title | German: | EMPFÄNGER FÜR DIGITALEN TONRUNDFUNK SOWIE VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR FORMATUMWANDLUNG EINER DAB-DATENFOLGE | [1997/47] | English: | DAB RECEIVER, APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR A FORMAT CONVERSION OF A DAB DATA SEQUENCE | [1997/47] | French: | RECEPTEUR DE RADIODIFFUSION AUDIONUMERIQUE (RAN), DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE POUR CONVERTIR LE FORMAT D'UNE SEQUENCE DE DONNEES RAN | [1997/47] | Entry into regional phase | 04.07.1997 | National basic fee paid | 04.07.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.10.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.10.1997 | Examination requested [1997/50] | 09.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0576012 (SONY CORP [JP]); | [AP]EP0731575 (NOKIA TECHNOLOGY GMBH [DE]); | [AP]WO9528810 (FRANCE TELECOM [FR], et al) |