EP0854958 - WELD-FREE GRATINGS FOR BRIDGE DECKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.07.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.09.2004 [2004/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mangone Enterprises 534 Fourth Avenue New Kensington, PA 15068 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/31] | For all designated states Mango Enterprises 534 Fourth Avenue New Kensington, PA 15068 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MANGONE, Ronald, W. 534 Fourth Avenue New Kensington, PA 15068 / US | [1998/31] | Representative(s) | Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer, et al Ladas & Parry LLP Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/08] | Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/31] | Baillie, Iain Cameron Ladas & Parry, Altheimer Eck 2 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96929734.0 | 21.08.1996 | [1998/31] | WO1996US13702 | Priority number, date | US19950541732 | 10.10.1995 Original published format: US 541732 | US19960589500 | 22.01.1996 Original published format: US 589500 | [1998/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9713934 | Date: | 17.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0854958 | Date: | 29.07.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.04.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.04.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | E04C2/42, E01D19/12 | [1998/31] | CPC: |
E04C2/423 (EP,US);
E01D19/125 (EP,US);
E04C2/425 (EP,US);
E01D2101/268 (EP,US);
E01D2101/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | GB [1999/06] |
Former [1998/31] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | SCHWEISSFREIE ROSTE FÜR BRÜCKENDECKEN | [1998/31] | English: | WELD-FREE GRATINGS FOR BRIDGE DECKS | [1998/31] | French: | GRILLAGES SANS SOUDURE POUR TABLIERS DE PONTS | [1998/31] | Entry into regional phase | 05.05.1998 | National basic fee paid | 05.05.1998 | Search fee paid | 05.05.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.05.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.05.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 05.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/31] | 12.05.1998 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 11.09.1998 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 11.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/36] | 02.04.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2004/36] | Request for further processing for: | 02.04.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 02.04.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.04.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2003 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [AP]US5463786 (MANGONE RONALD W [US], et al); | [A]US2645985 (BEEBE GERALD T, et al); | [A]US2834267 (BEEBE GERALD T) | by applicant | US3260023 | US4865486 | US2128753 | US2190214 | US2645985 | US2834267 | US4452025 | US4780021 |