EP0852035 - A HIGH AVAILABILITY COMPUTER SYSTEM AND METHODS RELATED THERETO [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.03.2003 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.05.2003 [2003/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DATA GENERAL CORPORATION 4400 Computer Drive Westboro Massachusetts 01580 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/28] | For all designated states DATA GENERAL CORPORATION 4400 Computer Drive Westboro Massachusetts 01580 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAXTER, William, F. 273 Hollis Street Holliston, MA 01746 / US | 02 /
WEILER, Pat, J. 14 Mashpee Circle Northboro, MA 02146 / US | 03 /
COX, Joseph N. Main Street Middleboro, MA 02346 / US | 04 /
GELINAS, Robert, G. 47 Flanders Road Westboro, MA 01581 / US | 05 /
GILLOTT, Barry, E. 270-46 Sunderland Road Worchester, MA 01640 / US | 06 /
GUYER, James, M. 246 Brewer Street Northboro, MA 01532 / US | 07 /
HEYDA, Andrea 4 Magnolia Drive Acton, MA 01720 / US | 08 /
HUCK, Dan, R. 11 Bayberry Circle Shrewsbury, MA 01545 / US | 09 /
HUNT, Michael, F. 7 Joanne Drive 3 Ashland, MA 01721 / US | 10 /
KEATING, David, L. 56 Pinecrest Road Holliston, MA 01746 / US | 11 /
KIMMELL, Jeff, S. 107 Crane Meadow Place Chapel Hill, NC 27514 / US | 12 /
PIKE, Rob, J. 15 Somerset Street 3 Worcester, MA 01609 / US | 13 /
RADOGNA, Tom, V. 5 Portsmore Lane Framington, MA 01701 / US | 14 /
ROUX, Phil, J. 12 Jones Road Holliston, MA 01746 / US | 15 /
SHERMAN, Art, A. 96 Meetinghouse Ashland, MA 01721 / US | 16 /
SPORTER, Michael 31 Longfellow Road Wellesly, MA 02181 / US | 17 /
TRUEBENBACH, Liz, M. 5 Firecut Lane Sudbury, MA 01776 / US | 18 /
TUCKER, Doug, J. 10m Thayer Street Northboro, MA 01532 / US | 19 /
VALENTINE, Rob, P. 10 Greenwood Drive Auburn, MA 01501 / US | 20 /
YEUNG, Simon N. 48 Harvard Avenue Ap. No 5 Brookline, MA 02146 / US | [1998/28] | Representative(s) | Abnett, Richard Charles Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/28] | Abnett, Richard Charles REDDIE & GROSE 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 96929744.9 | 14.08.1996 | [1998/28] | WO1996US13742 | Priority number, date | US19950002320P | 14.08.1995 Original published format: US 2320 P | [1998/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9707457 | Date: | 27.02.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0852035 | Date: | 08.07.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.02.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.02.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/00, G06F11/22 | [1999/41] | CPC: |
G06F11/2289 (EP,US);
G06F11/22 (EP,US);
G06F11/267 (EP,US);
G06F12/0813 (EP,US);
G06F13/36 (EP,US);
G06F2212/2542 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/28] | G06F11/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1998/28] | Title | German: | HOCHVERFÜGBARES RECHNERSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN DAZU | [1998/28] | English: | A HIGH AVAILABILITY COMPUTER SYSTEM AND METHODS RELATED THERETO | [1998/28] | French: | SYSTEME INFORMATIQUE A GRANDE DISPONIBILITE ET PROCEDES CONNEXES | [1998/28] | Entry into regional phase | 11.02.1998 | National basic fee paid | 11.02.1998 | Search fee paid | 11.02.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.02.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 11.02.1998 | Examination requested [1998/28] | 05.03.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [YP]US5535405 (BYERS LARRY L [US], et al); | [AP]US5533188 (PALUMBO DANIEL L [US]); | [AP]US5519714 (NAKAMURA YOSHIYUKI [JP], et al); | [YP]US5487074 (SULLIVAN PATRICK [US]); | [YP]US5485604 (MIYOSHI HIROAKI [JP], et al); | [Y]US5396619 (WALTON SCOTT D [US]); | [Y]US5392297 (BELL MARTIN J [US], et al); | [A]US5285153 (AHANIN BAHRAM [US], et al); | [Y]US5271019 (EDWARDS ROBERT [US], et al); | [A]US5260979 (PARKER LANNY L [US], et al); | [Y]US5157781 (HARWOOD WALLACE B [US], et al); | [X]US5146585 (SMITH III THOMAS B [US]); | [A]US4961013 (OBERMEYER JR JOHN R [US], et al); | [Y]US4920540 (BATY KURT F [US]); | [Y]US4873685 (MILLIS JR HUGH L [US]); | [Y]US4801869 (SPROGIS EDMUND J [US]); | [Y]US4644498 (BEDARD JAMES F [US], et al); | [Y]US3226569 (JAMES DWIGHT C); | [Y]US3069562 (STEELE FLOYD G) |