EP0850352 - INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE WITH CRANKCASE PRESSURE BARRIER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.02.2000 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 10.09.2008 [2008/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HAMY, Norbert 226 The Kingsway Etobicoke Ontario M9A 3T5 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1998/27] | For all designated states HAMY, Norbert 226 The Kingsway Etobicoke, Ontario M9A 3T5 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1998/27] | Representative(s) | Gemmell, Peter Alan, et al Dummett Copp LLP 25 The Square Martlesham Heath Ipswich IP5 3SL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | Gemmell, Peter Alan, et al Dummett Copp 25 The Square Martlesham Heath Ipswich IP5 3SL Suffolk / GB | ||
Former [1999/15] | Gemmell, Peter Alan, Dr., et al Dummett Copp, 25 The Square, Martlesham Heath Ipswich, Suffolk IP5 3SL / GB | ||
Former [1998/27] | Gemmell, Peter Alan, Dr., et al Dummett Copp, 25 The Square, Martlesham Heath Ipswich, Suffolk IP5 7SL / GB | Application number, filing date | 96929986.6 | 13.09.1996 | [1998/27] | WO1996CA00611 | Priority number, date | US19950003796 | 15.09.1995 Original published format: US 3796 | [1998/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9710417 | Date: | 20.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0850352 | Date: | 01.07.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.03.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0850352 | Date: | 21.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.03.1997 | Classification | IPC: | F02B33/12 | [1998/27] | CPC: |
F01L7/021 (EP,US);
F01L3/205 (EP,US);
F01L7/12 (EP,US);
F02B33/12 (EP,US);
F02B1/04 (EP,US);
F02B2075/025 (EP,US);
F02B2075/027 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1998/27] | Title | German: | BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE MIT KURBELGEHÄUSEDRUCKSPERRE | [1999/13] | English: | INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE WITH CRANKCASE PRESSURE BARRIER | [1998/27] | French: | MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE AVEC BARRIERE DE PRESSION DE CARTER | [1998/27] |
Former [1998/27] | BREMKRAFTMASCHINE MIT KÜRBELGEHAUSEDRUKSPERRE | Entry into regional phase | 09.04.1998 | National basic fee paid | 09.04.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.04.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.04.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/27] | 03.08.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.09.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.12.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 29.12.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.04.1999 | SE | 21.04.1999 | [2002/23] |
Former [2000/24] | AT | 21.04.1999 | Cited in | International search | [X]NL12006C (BILLARD) [X] 1,3,4* the whole document *; | [X]US2215793 (GRAHAM MAYES) [X] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [X]DE4205663 (TONTCH PETER [DE]) [X] 1-4 * the whole document * |