EP0793098 - MULTI-CAPILLARY ELECTROPHORETIC APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.05.1998 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.05.1998 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.06.1998 [1998/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 9, Kanda-Tsukasacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/36] | For all designated states OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 9, Kanda-Tsukasacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUNATO, Masayoshi 1-4-5, Kasugamotomachi Hirakata-shi Osaka 573-01 / JP | 02 /
NAGASHIMA, Taku 9-14-203, Nakamiyayamato-cho Hirakata-shi Osaka 573 / JP | [1997/36] | Representative(s) | von Fischern, Bernhard, et al Hoffmann - Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/36] | Ritter und Edler von Fischern, Bernhard, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96930415.3 | 13.09.1996 | [1997/36] | WO1996JP02650 | Priority number, date | JP19950238836 | 18.09.1995 Original published format: JP 23883695 | [1997/36] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9711362 | Date: | 27.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0793098 | Date: | 03.09.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.03.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.03.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/447, G01N21/59, G01N21/64 | [1997/36] | CPC: |
G01N27/44782 (EP);
G01N27/447 (KR);
G01N21/59 (KR);
G01N21/64 (KR);
G01N27/44721 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/36] | Title | German: | ELEKTROPHORETISCHES VIELFACHKAPILLARGERÄT | [1997/36] | English: | MULTI-CAPILLARY ELECTROPHORETIC APPARATUS | [1997/36] | French: | DISPOSITIF ELECTROPHORETIQUE MULTICAPILLAIRE | [1997/36] | Entry into regional phase | 16.05.1997 | Translation filed | 16.05.1997 | National basic fee paid | 16.05.1997 | Search fee paid | 16.05.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.07.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/39] | 29.04.1998 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1998/26] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0587281 (BECKMAN INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [A] 1-5 * column 24, line 15 - line 35; figure 7 *; | [A]US4343991 (FUJIWARA TOSHIHIDE, et al) [A] 1-5 * column 1, line 30 - column 2, line 20; figure 3 * * column 3, line 10 - line 55 * * column 5, line 30 - column 6, line 35 *; | [A]EP0476792 (UNIV NEBRASKA [US]) [A] 1-5 * column 10, line 40 - column 11, line 5 * * page 19, column 40, line 20 - page 25 * * column 21, line 15 - column 22, line 25; claims 1,7 *; | [A]EP0670374 (LI COR INC [US]) [A] 1-5 * page 32, line 45 - page 34, line 55; claim 3 * | International search | [A]JPS5351797 (SHIMADZU CORP); | [A]JPH04233840 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH); | [A]JPH0579469U ; | [A]JPH0593711 (HITACHI LTD) |