EP0866276 - GASIFICATION AIDING APPARATUS FOR GAS APPLIANCES OF HIGH HEATING VALUE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.11.2003 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.01.2004 [2004/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tokai Corporation 872-18, Toukaichiba-machi Midori-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken 226 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/39] | For all designated states Tokai Corporation 872-18, Toukaichiba-machi Midori-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken 226 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIFUNE, Hideo, Main Factory, Tokai Corporation 3-4 Shimohara, Subashiri, Oyama-cho Sunto-gun, Shizuoka-ken 410-14 / JP | 02 /
NAKAMURA, Yasuaki, Main Factory, Tokai Corporation 3-4, Shimohara, Subashiri, Oyama-cho Sunto-gun, Shizuoka-ken 410-14 / JP | [1998/39] | Representative(s) | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/39] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106 80797 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96930420.3 | 17.09.1996 | [1998/39] | WO1996JP02655 | Priority number, date | JP19950324470 | 13.12.1995 Original published format: JP 32447095 | [1998/39] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9721961 | Date: | 19.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0866276 | Date: | 23.09.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.06.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.06.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F24C3/14, F17C7/04 | [1999/22] | CPC: |
F17C7/04 (EP,KR,US);
F17C2201/0109 (EP,KR,US);
F17C2201/0119 (EP,KR,US);
F17C2201/035 (EP,KR,US);
F17C2201/058 (EP,KR,US);
F17C2205/0107 (EP,KR,US);
F17C2205/0111 (EP,KR,US);
F17C2221/035 (EP,KR,US);
F17C2223/0153 (EP,KR,US);
F17C2223/033 (EP,KR,US);
F17C2227/0309 (EP,KR,US);
F17C2227/0383 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [1998/39] | F24C3/14 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1998/39] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR FÖRDERUNG DER VERGASUNG FÜR GASBETRIEBENE APPARATE MIT HOHEN HEIZWERTEN | [1998/39] | English: | GASIFICATION AIDING APPARATUS FOR GAS APPLIANCES OF HIGH HEATING VALUE | [1998/39] | French: | DISPOSITIF FAVORISANT LE PASSAGE EN PHASE GAZEUSE POUR APPAREIL A GAZ POSSEDANT UNE VALEUR DE CHAUFFAGE ELEVEE | [1998/39] | Entry into regional phase | 15.06.1998 | Translation filed | 15.06.1998 | National basic fee paid | 15.06.1998 | Search fee paid | 15.06.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.06.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.07.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 15.06.1998 | Examination requested [1998/39] | 31.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/03] | 12.08.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2004/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2003 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]JPS54100880U ; | [A]JPS54123726 (TIGER VACUUM BOTTLE IND); | [A]JPS5525757 (AOYANAGI KEIJI) | by applicant | JPH05525757 | JPS54100880 |