EP0848790 - PRESS DRIVE WITH OIL SHEAR CLUTCH/BRAKE DRIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.03.2003 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Midwest Brake Bond Co. 26255 Groesbeck Highway Warren, MI 48089 / US | [1998/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOMMER, Gordon, Maurice 25 Crestwood Drive Grosse Pointe Shores, MI 48236 / US | [1998/26] | Representative(s) | Price, Nigel John King, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/26] | Price, Nigel John King, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 96930696.8 | 04.09.1996 | [1998/26] | WO1996US14198 | Priority number, date | US19950523279 | 05.09.1995 Original published format: US 523279 | [1998/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9709541 | Date: | 13.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0848790 | Date: | 24.06.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.03.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0848790 | Date: | 02.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.03.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F16D11/04, F16D67/02 | [1998/26] | CPC: |
F16D65/84 (EP,US);
B30B15/10 (EP,US);
F16D55/40 (EP,US);
F16D2055/0058 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/26] | Title | German: | PRESSANTRIEB MIT KUPPLUNGS-BREMSANTRIEB MIT HYDRAULISCHER SCHERUNG | [1998/26] | English: | PRESS DRIVE WITH OIL SHEAR CLUTCH/BRAKE DRIVES | [1998/26] | French: | COMMANDE DE PRESSE AVEC COMMANDES D'EMBRAYAGE/FREIN A CISAILLEMENT DE L'HUILE | [1998/26] | Entry into regional phase | 13.03.1998 | National basic fee paid | 13.03.1998 | Search fee paid | 13.03.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.03.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 13.03.1998 | Examination requested [1998/26] | 27.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.10.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.01.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 28.01.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1998 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   11.12.1998 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.05.2002 | BE | 02.05.2002 | CH | 02.05.2002 | FI | 02.05.2002 | FR | 02.05.2002 | GR | 02.05.2002 | LI | 02.05.2002 | NL | 02.05.2002 | DK | 02.08.2002 | PT | 02.08.2002 | SE | 02.08.2002 | GB | 04.09.2002 | IE | 04.09.2002 | LU | 04.09.2002 | ES | 28.11.2002 | [2006/14] |
Former [2004/40] | AT | 02.05.2002 | |
BE | 02.05.2002 | ||
CH | 02.05.2002 | ||
FI | 02.05.2002 | ||
GR | 02.05.2002 | ||
LI | 02.05.2002 | ||
NL | 02.05.2002 | ||
DK | 02.08.2002 | ||
PT | 02.08.2002 | ||
SE | 02.08.2002 | ||
GB | 04.09.2002 | ||
IE | 04.09.2002 | ||
LU | 04.09.2002 | ||
ES | 28.11.2002 | ||
FR | 10.01.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 02.05.2002 | |
BE | 02.05.2002 | ||
CH | 02.05.2002 | ||
GR | 02.05.2002 | ||
LI | 02.05.2002 | ||
NL | 02.05.2002 | ||
DK | 02.08.2002 | ||
PT | 02.08.2002 | ||
SE | 02.08.2002 | ||
GB | 04.09.2002 | ||
IE | 04.09.2002 | ||
LU | 04.09.2002 | ||
ES | 28.11.2002 | ||
FR | 10.01.2003 | ||
Former [2004/21] | AT | 02.05.2002 | |
BE | 02.05.2002 | ||
CH | 02.05.2002 | ||
GR | 02.05.2002 | ||
LI | 02.05.2002 | ||
NL | 02.05.2002 | ||
DK | 02.08.2002 | ||
PT | 02.08.2002 | ||
SE | 02.08.2002 | ||
GB | 04.09.2002 | ||
IE | 04.09.2002 | ||
ES | 28.11.2002 | ||
FR | 10.01.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 02.05.2002 | |
BE | 02.05.2002 | ||
CH | 02.05.2002 | ||
GR | 02.05.2002 | ||
LI | 02.05.2002 | ||
NL | 02.05.2002 | ||
DK | 02.08.2002 | ||
PT | 02.08.2002 | ||
SE | 02.08.2002 | ||
IE | 04.09.2002 | ||
ES | 28.11.2002 | ||
FR | 10.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/48] | AT | 02.05.2002 | |
BE | 02.05.2002 | ||
CH | 02.05.2002 | ||
GR | 02.05.2002 | ||
LI | 02.05.2002 | ||
NL | 02.05.2002 | ||
DK | 02.08.2002 | ||
PT | 02.08.2002 | ||
SE | 02.08.2002 | ||
IE | 04.09.2002 | ||
FR | 10.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/47] | AT | 02.05.2002 | |
CH | 02.05.2002 | ||
GR | 02.05.2002 | ||
LI | 02.05.2002 | ||
NL | 02.05.2002 | ||
DK | 02.08.2002 | ||
PT | 02.08.2002 | ||
SE | 02.08.2002 | ||
IE | 04.09.2002 | ||
FR | 10.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 02.05.2002 | |
CH | 02.05.2002 | ||
GR | 02.05.2002 | ||
LI | 02.05.2002 | ||
NL | 02.05.2002 | ||
DK | 02.08.2002 | ||
PT | 02.08.2002 | ||
SE | 02.08.2002 | ||
IE | 04.09.2002 | ||
Former [2003/42] | AT | 02.05.2002 | |
CH | 02.05.2002 | ||
GR | 02.05.2002 | ||
LI | 02.05.2002 | ||
NL | 02.05.2002 | ||
PT | 02.08.2002 | ||
SE | 02.08.2002 | ||
IE | 04.09.2002 | ||
Former [2003/21] | AT | 02.05.2002 | |
CH | 02.05.2002 | ||
GR | 02.05.2002 | ||
LI | 02.05.2002 | ||
NL | 02.05.2002 | ||
PT | 02.08.2002 | ||
SE | 02.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/20] | AT | 02.05.2002 | |
CH | 02.05.2002 | ||
GR | 02.05.2002 | ||
LI | 02.05.2002 | ||
NL | 02.05.2002 | ||
SE | 02.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/16] | AT | 02.05.2002 | |
CH | 02.05.2002 | ||
LI | 02.05.2002 | ||
NL | 02.05.2002 | ||
SE | 02.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/10] | AT | 02.05.2002 | |
NL | 02.05.2002 | ||
SE | 02.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | NL | 02.05.2002 | |
SE | 02.08.2002 | ||
Former [2002/46] | SE | 02.08.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]BE512910 (KNOCHL) [X] 1 * page 4, line 8 - page 5, line 4; figure 1 * [A] 4; | [A]DE750867 (KONRAD MODRACH MASCHINENFABRIK) [A] 1,4* the whole document *; | [A]DE3219203 (HEID AG MASCHF [AT]) [A] 1,4 * page 6, line 6 - page 7, line 35; figure . * | International search | [A]US3182776 (SOMMER GORDON M); | [X]US3494450 (MANKOWSKY VINCENT J, et al); | [A]US3614999 (SOMMER GORDON M); | [XP]US5462147 (SHERMAN JAMES F [US]) |