EP0923473 - BRAKE CONTROL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.09.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION P.O. Box 33114 Detroit, MI 48232 / US | [1999/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RIZZO, Michael, Douglas 1897 Mayfair White Lake, MI 48383 / US | 02 /
CARSON, Douglass, L. 29520 Geraldine Farmington, MI 48336 / US | 03 /
PASTOR, Stephen, Robert 28454 Golf Pointe Boulevard Farmington Hills, MI 48331 / US | 04 /
PAUL, Ronald 6429 Abington Detroit, MI 48228 / US | 05 /
BASSETT, Duane, Edward 6239 Silverbrooke West West Bloomfield, MI 48332 / US | 06 /
TIERNEY, Gordon, Leo 7301 Valley Green Drive Washington, MI 48094 / US | [1999/25] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/25] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner Postfach 22 16 11 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96930770.1 | 06.09.1996 | [1999/25] | WO1996US14422 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9809854 | Date: | 12.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0923473 | Date: | 23.06.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.03.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0923473 | Date: | 20.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B60T8/00 | [1999/25] | CPC: |
B60T8/1755 (EP);
B60T2220/04 (EP);
B60T2260/09 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/25] | Title | German: | BREMSSTEUERUNGSSYSTEM | [1999/25] | English: | BRAKE CONTROL SYSTEM | [1999/25] | French: | SYSTEME DE COMMANDE DE FREINAGE | [1999/25] | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.1999 | National basic fee paid | 18.03.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.03.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/25] | 07.08.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE19537791 (VOLKSWAGEN) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2695613 (RENAULT) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9104891 (BOSCH) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2257761 (MERCEDES - BENZ) [A] 1-9 * page 3, line 5 - page 5, line 10 * * page 6, line 5 - page 12, line 33; figures 1-10 *; | [A]WO9205986 (BOSCH) [A] 1-9 * page 2, line 25 - page 9, line 21 * * page 10, line 1 - page 12, line 6; figures 1A-4 * |