EP0880823 - HIGH IMPEDANCE RATIO WIDEBAND TRANSFORMER CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.01.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2002 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.02.2002 [2002/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vari-L Company, Inc. 11101 East 51st Avenue Denver Colorado 80239 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/49] | For all designated states Vari-L Company, Inc. 11101 East 51st Avenue Denver Colorado 80239 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REYNOLDS, Robert, L. 806 Main Street Platteville, CO 80651-0894 / US | [1998/49] | Representative(s) | Tomlinson, Kerry John Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/49] | Tomlinson, Kerry John Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 96930789.1 | 09.09.1996 | [1998/49] | WO1996US14459 | Priority number, date | US19950527861 | 14.09.1995 Original published format: US 527861 | [1998/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9710645 | Date: | 20.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0880823 | Date: | 02.12.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.03.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.03.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H03H7/42, H03H7/38 | [1998/49] | CPC: |
H03H7/42 (EP,KR,US);
H01F19/06 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/49] | Title | German: | BREITBANDÜBERTRAGERSCHALTUNG MIT HOHEM IMPEDANZTRANSFORMATIONSVERHÄLTNIS | [1998/49] | English: | HIGH IMPEDANCE RATIO WIDEBAND TRANSFORMER CIRCUIT | [1998/49] | French: | CIRCUIT DE TRANSFORMATEUR A LARGE BANDE A RAPPORT D'IMPEDANCE ELEVE | [1998/49] | Entry into regional phase | 09.04.1998 | National basic fee paid | 09.04.1998 | Search fee paid | 09.04.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.04.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.02.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 09.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/49] | 20.12.2001 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [AP]US3244998 (BROADHEAD JR SAMUEL L); | [Y]US3882432 (BOWMAN DENNIS W, et al); | [Y]US4201962 (HOSOYA NOBUKAZU [JP]); | [Y]US5051710 (KALTENECKER ROBERT S [US]); | [Y]US5216393 (WANDEL PETER [DE]); | [Y]US5309120 (KOONTZ FLOYD A [US]); | [AP]US5495212 (DECRAMER JOHN E [US]) |