EP0850538 - TELECOMMUNICATIONS MULTIMEDIA CONFERENCING SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.09.2000 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.09.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.11.2000 [2000/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General DataComm, Inc. 1579 Straits Turnpike, P.O. Box 1299 Middlebury, CT 06762-1299 / US | [1998/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KERR, Gordon 15429 Oakwood Pierrefonds Quebec H9H 1Y4 / CA | [1998/27] | Representative(s) | Gibson, Stewart Harry Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Churchill House Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/27] | Gibson, Stewart Harry URQUHART-DYKES & LORD, Three Trinity Court, 21-27 Newport Road Cardiff CF2 1AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 96930840.2 | 12.09.1996 | [1998/27] | WO1996US14621 | Priority number, date | US19950529009 | 15.09.1995 Original published format: US 529009 | [1998/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9710674 | Date: | 20.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0850538 | Date: | 01.07.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.03.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.03.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/15 | [1998/27] | CPC: |
H04N21/2368 (EP,US);
H04N21/242 (EP,US);
H04N21/4305 (EP,US);
H04N21/43072 (EP,US);
H04N21/4341 (EP,US);
H04N21/64307 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1998/27] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN DER MULTIMEDIA-TELEKONFERENZ | [1998/30] | English: | TELECOMMUNICATIONS MULTIMEDIA CONFERENCING SYSTEM AND METHOD | [1998/27] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE TELECONFERENCE MULTIMEDIA | [1998/27] |
Former [1998/27] | MULTIMEDIA-TELEKONFERENZSYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN | Entry into regional phase | 15.04.1998 | National basic fee paid | 15.04.1998 | Search fee paid | 15.04.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.04.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.02.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 15.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/27] | 05.01.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/44] | 15.05.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2000/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1999 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO9424803 (AT & T CORP [US]) [X] 1-3,9,10 * page 7, line 4 - page 12, line 4 * * page 12, line 5 - page 14, line 2 * * page 17, line 6 - line 27 * * page 21, line 19 - line 32 * [A] 4-8; | [A]WO9519670 (SCIENTIFIC ATLANTA [US]) [A] 1,7,8 * page 21, line 9 - page 26, line 8 *; | [A]WO9429979 (INTELLIGENCE AT LARGE INC [US]) [A] 1-3,7-10 * page 18 - page 19 * * page 32 - page 33 *; | [A]US5375068 (PALMER RICKY S [US], et al) [A] 1-3,7-10 * column 1, line 33 - column 3, line 53 * * column 14, line 7 - line 27 * | International search | [XP]US5506954 (ARSHI TAYMOOR [US], et al); | [YP]US5533021 (BRANSTAD MARK W [US], et al) |