EP0902783 - HYDROLYSIS-PROMOTING TAXANE HYDROPHOBIC DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.02.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.04.2003 [2003/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. 800 Gateway Boulevard South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/03] | For all designated states Elan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 800 Gateway Boulevard South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | ||
Former [1999/12] | For all designated states THE LIPOSOME COMPANY, INC. One Research Way Princeton Forrestal Center Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAYHEW, Eric 26 Allison Court Monmouth Junction, NJ 08852 / US | 02 /
ALI, Shaukat 24 Jamie Court Monmouth Junction, NJ 08852 / US | 03 /
JANOFF, Andrew, S. 560 Countess Drive Yardley, PA 19067 / US | [1999/12] | Representative(s) | Weiss, Wolfgang, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Richard-Strauss-Strasse 80 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/12] | Weiss, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Chem. Dr., et al Patentanwälte Weickmann & Partner, Kopernikusstrasse 9 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96930847.7 | 12.09.1996 | [1999/12] | WO1996US14631 | Priority number, date | US19950003575P | 12.09.1995 Original published format: US 3575 P | [1999/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9710234 | Date: | 20.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0902783 | Date: | 24.03.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.03.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0902783 | Date: | 17.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.03.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C07D305/14, A61K31/335 | [1999/12] | CPC: |
A61K9/127 (EP,US);
C07D305/14 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/335 (KR);
A61P35/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/12] | Title | German: | HYDROLYSIERBARE HYDROPHOBE TAXANDERIVATE | [1999/12] | English: | HYDROLYSIS-PROMOTING TAXANE HYDROPHOBIC DERIVATIVES | [1999/12] | French: | DERIVES HYDROPHOBES DE TAXANE FAVORISANT L'HYDROLYSE | [1999/12] | Entry into regional phase | 12.03.1998 | National basic fee paid | 12.03.1998 | Search fee paid | 12.03.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.03.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.04.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 12.03.1998 | Examination requested [1999/12] | 28.03.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.10.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.01.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 04.01.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP02008590.8 / EP1229030 | Opposition(s) | 20.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PA]WO9621658 (LIPOSOME CO INC [US]) [PA] 1,16-20,24,25* the whole document * | International search | [A]US5059699 (KINGSTON DAVID G I [US], et al); | [A]US5278324 (KINGSTON DAVID G I [US], et al) |