EP0852470 - INSTALLATION FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF SHOE INSERTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.02.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.03.2002 [2002/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rickli, Hans-Rudolf Seestrasse 18 3600 Thun / CH | [1998/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1998/29] | Representative(s) | AMMANN PATENTANWÄLTE AG Schwarztorstrasse 31 Postfach 5135 3001 Bern / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1999/42] | AMMANN PATENTANWÄLTE AG BERN AMMANN INGENIEURS-CONSEILS EN PROPRIETE INTELLECTUELLE SA BERNE AMMANN PATENT ATTORNEYS LTD BERNE Schwarztorstrasse 31 Postfach 3001 Bern / CH | ||
Former [1999/17] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1998/29] | AMMANN INGENIEURS-CONSEILS EN PROPRIETE INTELLECTUELLE SA BERNE Schwarztorstrasse 31 3001 Bern / CH | Application number, filing date | 96930942.6 | 27.09.1996 | [1998/29] | WO1996CH00337 | Priority number, date | CH19950002723 | 27.09.1995 Original published format: CH 272395 | CH19950002847 | 27.09.1995 Original published format: CH 284795 | [1998/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9711619 | Date: | 03.04.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0852470 | Date: | 15.07.1998 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.04.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.04.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A43D1/02, A43D39/00 | [1998/29] | CPC: |
A43D1/02 (EP,KR);
A43D39/00 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1998/29] | Title | German: | ANLAGE ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON EINLAGEN IN SCHUHE | [1998/29] | English: | INSTALLATION FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF SHOE INSERTS | [1998/29] | French: | INSTALLATION POUR LA PRODUCTION DE SUPPORTS ORTHOPEDIQUES POUR CHAUSSURES | [1998/29] | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.1998 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.04.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.03.1998 | Examination requested [1998/33] | 07.04.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.03.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.05.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/13] | 17.10.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2002/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]DE4404695 (WALTER DIETMAR [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,15 * the whole document * [A] 3,5-14,16; | [A]WO9505791 (LAUTH KLAUS [DE], et al); | [A]US4745290 (FRANKEL DAVID [US], et al); | [A]EP0014022 (HOOGSTRAAT TECH ADVIES HANDEL [NL]); | [A]US5164793 (WOLFERSBERGER CHARLES [US], et al); | [A]EP0284922 (AMFIT INC [US]); | [A]US3696456 (DUNHAM TOM DAVID, et al) |