EP0852346 - ROBOT LANGUAGE PROCESSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.11.2002 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.01.2003 [2003/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Yaskawa Denki 2-1, Kurosaki-Shiroishi Yahatanishi-ku Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 806-0004 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/28] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA YASKAWA DENKI 2-1, Kurosaki-Shiroishi Yahatanishi-Ku Kitakyushu-Shi Fukuoka 806 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKAOKA, Keiichi, Kabushiki Kaisha Yaskawa Denki 2-1, Kurosaki-Shiroishi, Yahatanishi-ku Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 806 / JP | 02 /
OHSAWA, Noriyuki, Kabushiki Kaisha Yaskawa Denki 2-1, Kurosaki-Shiroishi, Yahatanishi-ku Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 806 / JP | 03 /
MANTANI, Noriaki, Kabushiki Kaisha Yaskawa Denki 2-1, Kurosaki-Shiroishi, Yahatanishi-ku Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 806 / JP | 04 /
KANEHARA Takeyoshi, Kabushiki Kaisha Yaskawa Denki 2-1, Kurosaki-Shiroishi, Yahatanishi-ku Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 806 / JP | 05 /
TANAKA, Youichi, Kabushiki Kaisha Yaskawa Denki 2-1, Kurosaki-Shiroishi, Yahatanishi-ku Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 806 / JP | 06 /
KAWAI, Fumiaki, Kabushiki Kaisha Yaskawa Denki 2-1, Kurosaki-Shiroishi, Yahatanishi-ku Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 806 / JP | [1998/28] | Representative(s) | Fréchède, Michel Cabinet Plasseraud 52 Rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/28] | Fréchède, Michel Cabinet Plasseraud 84, rue d'Amsterdam F-75440 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 96931248.7 | 19.09.1996 | [1998/28] | WO1996JP02691 | Priority number, date | JP19950266508 | 19.09.1995 Original published format: JP 26650895 | [1998/28] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9711416 | Date: | 27.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0852346 | Date: | 08.07.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.03.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0852346 | Date: | 16.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.03.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/4068, B25J9/16 | [1998/52] | CPC: |
G05B19/4068 (EP,US);
B25J9/1671 (EP,US);
G05B2219/36074 (EP,US);
G05B2219/36143 (EP,US);
G05B2219/36257 (EP,US);
G05B2219/40099 (EP,US);
G05B2219/45104 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1998/28] | G05B19/4068 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1998/28] | Title | German: | PROZESSOR FÜR ROBOTERSPRACHE | [1998/28] | English: | ROBOT LANGUAGE PROCESSOR | [1998/28] | French: | PROCESSEUR DE LANGAGE ROBOTIQUE | [1998/28] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.1998 | Translation filed | 31.03.1998 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.1998 | Search fee paid | 31.03.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.03.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 31.03.1998 | Examination requested [1998/30] | 22.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.03.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.09.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.07.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 02.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0478772 (FANUC LTD [JP]) [A] 1,4 * the whole document *; | [A]US4834007 (MIYAZAKI KENICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,4 * the whole document *; | [A]US5175688 (SASAKI SHUNICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,4; | [A]EP0455817 (FANUC LTD [JP]) [A] 1,4 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9106050 (APPLIED BIOSYSTEMS [US]) [A] 19,22 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9523374 (AUTOMATION SYSTEMS AND PRODUCT [US]) [A] 19,22 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]JPS62269205 (KOBE STEEL LTD); | [Y]JPS62264375 (BROTHER IND LTD); | [Y]JPS62192806 (FANUC LTD); | [Y]JPH05289728 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [Y]JPH01231104 (RICOH KK); | [Y]JPH0543201U ; | [Y]JPS6189907U ; | [Y]JPS62121513 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [Y]JPH03154105 (TOSHIBA MACHINE CO LTD); | [Y]JPH033753 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) |