EP0959734 - A DEVICE FOR VENTILATING VEHICLE CHAIRS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.04.2002 [2002/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Walinov AB Snickaregatan 36 582 26 Linköping / SE | [1999/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LARSSON, Stefan, Gunnar Sjömansgatan 17 D S-413 15 Göteborg / SE | [1999/48] | Application number, filing date | 96931332.9 | 12.09.1996 | [1999/48] | WO1996SE01135 | Priority number, date | SE19950003184 | 14.09.1995 Original published format: SE 9503184 | [1999/48] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9709908 | Date: | 20.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0959734 | Date: | 01.12.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.03.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0959734 | Date: | 11.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 20.03.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A47C7/74 | [1999/48] | CPC: |
B60N2/5635 (EP,US);
B60N2/00 (KR);
A47C7/74 (EP,US);
B60N2/24 (KR);
B60N2/56 (EP,US);
B60N2/565 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1999/48] | Extension states | SI | 05.03.1998 | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM VENTILIEREN VON FAHRZEUGSITZEN | [1999/48] | English: | A DEVICE FOR VENTILATING VEHICLE CHAIRS | [1999/48] | French: | SYSTEME DE VENTILATION POUR SIEGE DE VEHICULE | [1999/48] | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.1997 | Translation filed | 30.01.1998 | National basic fee paid | 30.01.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.03.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 09.03.1998 | Examination requested [1999/48] | 09.03.1998 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 25.04.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 25.04.2000 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 10.08.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 11.10.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1999 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   03.12.1999 | 30.09.2000 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   22.12.2000 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 11.07.2001 | [2002/05] | Cited in | International search | [A]SE459389 (CHRISTER TENNSTEDT, et al) |