EP0855007 - FLUID HEATER WITH IMPROVED HEATING ELEMENTS CONTROLLER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.2005 Database last updated on 24.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEITZ, David 27285 Wells Lane Conroe, TX 77385 / US | For all designated states Kuhnel, Donald Route 1, Box 66 Houston, TX 78117 / US | [1998/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1998/31] | Representative(s) | Ruschke, Hans Edvard, et al Ruschke Madgwick Seide & Kollegen Patentanwälte Patent Attorney (UK) PartG mbB Postfach 86 06 29 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/31] | Ruschke, Hans Edvard, Dipl.-Ing., et al Ruschke Hartmann Becker Pienzenauerstrasse 2 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96931498.8 | 06.09.1996 | [1998/31] | WO1996US14441 | Priority number, date | US19950541833 | 10.10.1995 Original published format: US 541833 | [1998/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9714003 | Date: | 17.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/17] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0855007 | Date: | 29.07.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.04.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0855007 | Date: | 24.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.06.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F24H1/10, F24H9/20, G05D23/24, G05D23/19 | [2000/29] | CPC: |
G05D23/1951 (EP,US);
F24H15/215 (EP,US);
F24H15/248 (EP,US);
F24H15/269 (EP,US);
F24H15/37 (EP,US);
F24H15/407 (EP,US);
F24H15/414 (EP,US);
F24H9/2028 (EP,US);
G05D23/1917 (EP,US);
G05D23/24 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1998/31] | F24H1/10, F24H9/20 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, NL, SE [1998/31] | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGKEITSERHITZER MIT VERBESSERTER KONTROLLE DES HEIZELEMENTS | [1998/31] | English: | FLUID HEATER WITH IMPROVED HEATING ELEMENTS CONTROLLER | [1998/31] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CHAUFFAGE A FLUIDE AVEC CONTROLLEUR AMELIORE DES ELEMENTS CHAUFFANTS | [1998/31] | Entry into regional phase | 09.04.1998 | National basic fee paid | 09.04.1998 | Search fee paid | 09.04.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.04.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.05.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 09.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/31] | 04.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 02.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1999 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   21.01.2000 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 24.11.2004 | IT | 24.11.2004 | NL | 24.11.2004 | GR | 24.02.2005 | SE | 24.02.2005 | [2008/06] |
Former [2007/16] | ES | 24.11.2004 | |
NL | 24.11.2004 | ||
GR | 24.02.2005 | ||
SE | 24.02.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | NL | 24.11.2004 | |
GR | 24.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | GR | 24.02.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4511790 (KOZAK NORMAN M [US]) [A] 1* column A * | International search | [X]US4511790 (KOZAK NORMAN M [US]); | [Y]US4829159 (BRAUN WALTER [DE], et al); | [Y]US4920252 (YOSHINO TATSUO [JP]); | [X]US5020127 (EDDAS HARRY [US], et al); | [Y]US5053604 (ESCARAVAGE BRUNO [FR], et al); | [A]US5479558 (WHITE JR JAMES A [US], et al) | by applicant | US3787729 | US3952182 | US4333002 | US4337388 | US4511790 | US4567350 | US4604515 | EP0209867 | US5020127 | US5216743 |