EP0852630 - A METHOD FOF FORMING A NONWOVEN WEB EXHIBITING SURFACE ENERGY GRADIENTS AND INCREASED CALIPER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 01.06.2001 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2001 | Refusal of application | published on 18.07.2001 [2001/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/29] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CREE, James, William 1815 Taft Road Cincinnati, OH 45206 / US | 02 /
FERRAZ DO AMARAL RAVAGLIA, Luis Eduardo Calle Caroni Res. Eminence Palace Caracas District Federal 1060 / VE | [1998/29] | Representative(s) | Hirsch, Uwe T., et al Procter & Gamble Service GmbH IP Department Frankfurter Strasse 145 61476 Kronberg im Taunus / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/29] | Hirsch, Uwe Thomas, et al Procter & Gamble European Service GmbH, Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | Application number, filing date | 96931538.1 | 12.09.1996 | [1998/29] | WO1996US14642 | Priority number, date | US19950536225 | 29.09.1995 Original published format: US 536225 | [1998/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9712085 | Date: | 03.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0852630 | Date: | 15.07.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.04.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.04.1997 | Classification | IPC: | D04H1/44, A61F13/15 | [1998/29] | CPC: |
A61F13/512 (EP,US);
D04H1/44 (EP,KR,US);
A61F13/15 (KR);
A61F13/15577 (EP,US);
A61F13/51305 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24628 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24694 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24802 (EP,US);
Y10T442/102 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1998/29] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER SPINNVLIESS MIT GRADIERTEN OBERFLÄCHENERGIE UND ERHÖHTER DURCHFLUSS | [1998/29] | English: | A METHOD FOF FORMING A NONWOVEN WEB EXHIBITING SURFACE ENERGY GRADIENTS AND INCREASED CALIPER | [1998/29] | French: | PROCEDE DE REALISATION D'UN VOILE DE FIBRES NON TISSEES PRESENTANT DES GRADIENTS D'ENERGIE SUPERFICIELLE ET UNE EPAISSEUR ACCRUE | [1998/29] | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.1998 | National basic fee paid | 09.02.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.02.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.04.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.02.1998 | Examination requested [1998/29] | 26.05.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.09.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2001 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.02.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2001/29] | 21.02.2001 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 03.03.2001 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2001/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9503765 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [Y] 1-11 * page 3, line 8 - page 5, line 3; figure 36; claims 1,17 *; | [Y]WO9523699 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [Y] 1-11* page 3, line 27 - page 9, line 30 * |