EP0800418 - LIQUID FILTER INTENDED FOR OIL OR FUEL IN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE AND A SUITABLE ENGINE-SIDE FILTER CONNECTION FLANGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1997/42] | LIQUID FILTER INTENDED IN PARTICULAR FOR OIL OR FUEL IN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE, AND A SUITABLE ENGINE-SIDE FILTER CONNECTION FLANGE | ||
[2002/09] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.12.2003 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 26.05.2004 [2004/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hengst GmbH & Co. KG Nienkamp 75 48147 Münster / DE | [2002/51] |
Former [1997/42] | For all designated states Ing. Walter Hengst GmbH & Co. KG Nienkamp 75 48147 Münster / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAUMANN, Dieter Überwasserstrasse 10 D-48268 Greven-Gimbte / DE | [1997/42] | Representative(s) | Schulze Horn, Kathrin Schulze Horn Fachanwaltskanzlei für Gewerblichen Rechtsschutz Voßgasse 3 48143 Münster / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/40] | Schulze Horn, Kathrin Schulze Horn & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Goldstrasse 50 48147 Münster / DE | ||
Former [1997/42] | Schulze Horn & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Goldstrasse 50 48147 Münster / DE | Application number, filing date | 96931807.0 | 14.09.1996 | [1997/42] | WO1996EP04044 | Priority number, date | DE19951039918 | 27.10.1995 Original published format: DE 19539918 | [1997/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9716234 | Date: | 09.05.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0800418 | Date: | 15.10.1997 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.05.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0800418 | Date: | 05.02.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.05.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B01D35/153, B01D35/30, B01D35/16 | [1997/42] | CPC: |
B01D29/21 (EP,US);
B01D29/96 (EP,US);
B01D35/153 (EP,US);
B01D35/16 (EP,US);
B01D35/31 (EP,US);
F01M11/03 (EP,US);
F02M37/42 (EP,US);
F02M37/48 (EP,US);
B01D2201/162 (EP,US);
B01D2201/305 (EP,US);
B01D2201/34 (EP,US);
B01D2201/4084 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1997/42] | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGKEITSFILTER FÜR ÖL ODER KRAFTSTOFF EINER BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE UND DAZU PASSENDER MASCHINENSEITIGER FILTERANSCHLUSSFLANSCH | [2002/09] | English: | LIQUID FILTER INTENDED FOR OIL OR FUEL IN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE AND A SUITABLE ENGINE-SIDE FILTER CONNECTION FLANGE | [2002/09] | French: | FILTRE A LIQUIDES POUR L'HUILE OU LE CARBURANT D'UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE ET BRIDE DE RACCORDEMENT DU FILTRE APPROPRIEE COTE MOTEUR | [2002/09] |
Former [1997/42] | FLÜSSIGKEITSFILTER, INSBESONDERE FÜR ÖL ODER KRAFTSTOFF EINER BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE, UND DAZU PASSENDER MASCHINENSEITIGER FILTERANSCHLUSSFLANSCH | ||
Former [1997/42] | LIQUID FILTER INTENDED IN PARTICULAR FOR OIL OR FUEL IN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE, AND A SUITABLE ENGINE-SIDE FILTER CONNECTION FLANGE | ||
Former [1997/42] | FILTRE A LIQUIDES, EN PARTICULIER POUR L'HUILE OU LE CARBURANT D'UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE, ET BRIDE DE RACCORDEMENT DU FILTRE APPROPRIEE COTE MOTEUR | Entry into regional phase | 01.07.1997 | National basic fee paid | 04.06.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/42] | 19.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.06.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.04.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 02.07.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.11.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 05.02.2003 | SE | 05.05.2003 | [2004/22] |
Former [2003/32] | SE | 05.05.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3409219 (HENGST WALTER GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-12* figure 1 *; | [A]US4904382 (THOMSEN JACK W [US]) [A] 1-4 * figure 2 *; | [A]EP0408377 (PALL CORP [US]) [A] 1-4 * column 2, lines 4-16; figure 1; claims 1-10 *; | [A]US5049269 (SHAH SATISH S [US]) [A] 1-4 * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0653234 (KNECHT FILTERWERKE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-4,9-12 * figure 1 * | Examination | US3746171 |