EP0796414 - ROOF MOUNTING FOR AT LEAST ONE SOLAR-ENERGY COLLECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.08.1999 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.09.1999 [1999/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lang, Siegfried Gaildorferstrasse 50 74564 Crailsheim / DE | [1997/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1997/39] | Representative(s) | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/39] | von Hellfeld, Axel, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96931819.5 | 20.09.1996 | [1997/39] | WO1996EP04128 | Priority number, date | DE1995135104 | 21.09.1995 Original published format: DE 19535104 | [1997/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9711320 | Date: | 27.03.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0796414 | Date: | 24.09.1997 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.03.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.03.1997 | Classification | IPC: | F24J2/04 | [1997/39] | CPC: |
F24S25/613 (EP);
F24S20/67 (EP);
F24S25/33 (EP);
F24S25/632 (EP);
F24S2025/6002 (EP);
Y02A30/60 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, IT, LI [1997/39] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM MONTIEREN VON ZUMINDEST EINEM SONNENKOLLEKTOR AUF EINEM DACH | [1997/39] | English: | ROOF MOUNTING FOR AT LEAST ONE SOLAR-ENERGY COLLECTOR | [1997/39] | French: | DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE MONTER AU MOINS UN COLLECTEUR SOLAIRE SUR UN TOIT | [1997/39] | Entry into regional phase | 09.04.1997 | National basic fee paid | 09.04.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.04.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.04.1997 | Examination requested [1997/39] | 31.03.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/39] | 03.05.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1999/39] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1998 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2712446 (VIESSMANN HANS) [A] 1,2 * page 5, line 16 - page 7, line 12; figures 1-7 *; | [A]US4215677 (ERICKSON DONALD P [US]) [A] 1,2 * column 4, line 49 - column 6, line 5; figures 3A,4 * |