EP0847515 - A MANIFOLD FOR CONNECTING CIRCUITS OF A CENTRAL HEATING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.10.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.12.2002 [2002/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Monard (Research & Development) Limited 1 Hollymount, Blarney Road Cork / IE | [1998/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REA, Harold, Alexander 1 Hollymount, Blarney Road Cork / IE | [1998/25] | Representative(s) | Gorman, Francis Fergus, et al F. F. Gorman & Co. 15 Clanwilliam Square Dublin 2 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/25] | Gorman, Francis Fergus, et al F. F. Gorman & Co. 54, Merrion Square Dublin 2 / IE | Application number, filing date | 96931953.2 | 28.08.1996 | [1998/25] | WO1996IE00057 | Priority number, date | IE19950000663 | 29.08.1995 Original published format: IE 950663 | [1998/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9708498 | Date: | 06.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0847515 | Date: | 17.06.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0847515 | Date: | 12.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.03.1997 | Classification | IPC: | F24D3/10 | [1998/25] | CPC: |
F24D3/1091 (EP,US);
F24D12/02 (EP,US);
F24D3/1066 (EP,US);
Y02B30/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, FR, GB, IE, IT, NL, SE [1998/25] | Title | German: | HYDRAULISCHE WEICHE FÜR ZENTRALHEIZUNGSANLAGE | [1998/25] | English: | A MANIFOLD FOR CONNECTING CIRCUITS OF A CENTRAL HEATING SYSTEM | [1998/25] | French: | COLLECTEUR PERMETTANT DE RELIER LES CIRCUITS D'UN SYSTEME DE CHAUFFAGE CENTRAL | [1998/25] | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.1998 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.03.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.04.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.03.1998 | Examination requested [1998/25] | 20.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.04.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.10.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.07.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.04.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 27.06.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1998 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   21.10.1998 | 31.08.2001 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   27.09.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE4234960 (GRAMMER MEINRAD [DE]) [X] 1-11,17,18,21,22 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0387633 (ZORTEA REMBERT [AT]) [A] 1,13,15,21 * abstract *; | [A]CH630166 (ELIAS JIRI [CH]) [A] 1,6-11,19-21 * the whole document *; | [XP]DE4407807 (KRZYZIK WERNER [DE]) [XP] 1-3,9,10,12,17,18,21 * the whole document * |