EP0858594 - OPTICAL CARBON DIOXIDE SENSOR, AND ASSOCIATED METHODS OF MANUFACTURE AND USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.04.2004 [2004/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OPTICAL SENSORS INCORPORATED Suite A, 7615 Golden Triangle Drive Minneapolis, MN 55344 / US | [1998/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALDERETE, Jason, E. 302 Herman Terrace Hopkins, MN 55343 / US | 02 /
OLSTEIN, Alan, D. 1841 Walsh Lane St. Paul, MN 55118 / US | 03 /
FURLONG, Steven, C. 6292 Juneau Court North Maple Grove, MN 55311 / US | [1998/34] | Representative(s) | Belcher, Simon James Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Arena Point Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/34] | Belcher, Simon James Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Tower House Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 96933131.3 | 25.09.1996 | [1998/34] | WO1996US15353 | Priority number, date | US19950535878 | 28.09.1995 Original published format: US 535878 | [1998/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9712227 | Date: | 03.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0858594 | Date: | 19.08.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.04.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0858594 | Date: | 23.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.04.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/64 | [1998/34] | CPC: |
G01N21/643 (EP,US);
G01N21/7703 (EP,US);
G01N31/223 (EP,US);
G01N33/004 (EP,US);
G01N2021/6432 (EP,US);
G01N2021/772 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1998/34] | Title | German: | OPTISCHER CO2 SENSOR UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG UND ANWENDUNG | [1998/34] | English: | OPTICAL CARBON DIOXIDE SENSOR, AND ASSOCIATED METHODS OF MANUFACTURE AND USE | [1998/34] | French: | DETECTEUR OPTIQUE DE GAZ CARBONIQUE ET PROCEDES CORRESPONDANTS DE FABRICATION ET D'UTILISATION | [1998/34] | Entry into regional phase | 09.04.1998 | National basic fee paid | 09.04.1998 | Search fee paid | 09.04.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.04.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.04.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 09.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/34] | 25.10.1999 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.09.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 03.07.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 30.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 05.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP02015142.9 / EP1245947 | Opposition(s) | 26.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 23.04.2003 | ES | 30.10.2003 | [2004/04] |
Former [2004/01] | NL | 23.04.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]US4889407 (MARKLE DAVID R [US], et al) | [X] - ANNALS OF BIOMEDICAL ENGINEERING, 1983, Vol. 11, VUREK, G.G. et al., "A Fiber Optic PCO2 Sensor", pages 499-510. | [Y] - JOURNAL OF LIGHTWAVE TECHNOLOGY, July 1987, Vol. LT-5, No. 7, HIRSCHFELD, T. et al., "Laser-Fiber-Optic "Optrode" for Real Time In Vivo Blood Carbon Dioxide Level Monitoring", pages 1027-1033. |