EP0868476 - COMPOSITIONS OF EPOXYSILANE EMULSION ADDITIVES IN WATERBASED REACTIVE POLYMER DISPERSIONS AND METHODS OF PREPARATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.06.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady NY 12345 / US | ||
Former [2005/34] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY One River Road Schenectady, New York 12345 / US | ||
Former [2005/20] | For all designated states General Electric Company One River Road Schenectady, New York 12345 / US | ||
Former [2000/38] | For all designated states CROMPTON CORPORATION One American Lane Greenwich Connecticut 06831-2559 / US | ||
Former [2000/04] | For all designated states CK WITCO CORPORATION One American Lane Greenwich Connecticut 06831-2559 / US | ||
Former [1999/16] | For all designated states WITCO CORPORATION One American Lane Greenwich, Connecticut 06831-2559 / US | ||
Former [1998/41] | For all designated states OSi Specialties, Inc. One American Lane Greenwich, Connecticut 06831-2559 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OSTERHOLTZ, Frederick, D. 81 Oak Drive Pleasantville, NY 10570 / US | 02 /
POHL, Eric, R. 2501 Canterbury Way Mt. Kisco, NY 10549 / US | 03 /
CHEN, Ming, J. 475 Christian Herald Road, Apt A Valley Cottage, NY 10989-2220 / US | 04 /
CHAVES, Antonio 27 Bryant Avenue White Plains, NY 10605 / US | [1998/45] |
Former [1998/41] | 01 /
OSTERHOLTZ, Frederick, D. 81 Oak Drive Pleasantville, NY 10570 / US | ||
02 /
POHL, Eric, R. 2501 Canterbury Way Mt. Kisco, NY 10549 / US | |||
03 /
CHEN, Ming, J. 41 Poplar Road Garnerville, NY 10923 / US | |||
04 /
CHAVES, Antonio 27 Bryant Avenue White Plains, NY 10605 / US | Representative(s) | Wibbelmann, Jobst Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/41] | Wibbelmann, Jobst, Dr., Dipl.-Chem. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96933214.7 | 02.10.1996 | [1998/41] | WO1996US15732 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9814511 | Date: | 09.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0868476 | Date: | 07.10.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.04.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0868476 | Date: | 24.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.04.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C08K5/15 | [1998/41] | CPC: |
C08K5/5435 (EP,US);
C08K5/15 (KR);
C09D133/064 (EP,US);
C09D183/06 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C09D133/064, C08L2666/28 (EP,US);
C09D183/06, C08L2666/04 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1998/41] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN VON EPOXYSILAN-EMULSIONADDITIVEN IN REAKTIVEN POLYMERDISPERSIONEN AUF WASSERBASIS UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG | [1998/41] | English: | COMPOSITIONS OF EPOXYSILANE EMULSION ADDITIVES IN WATERBASED REACTIVE POLYMER DISPERSIONS AND METHODS OF PREPARATION | [1998/41] | French: | COMPOSITIONS D'ADDITIFS CONSTITUES D'UNE EMULSION D'EPOXYSILANE DANS DES DISPERSIONS DE POLYMERES REACTIFS A BASE D'EAU, ET LEURS PROCEDES DE PREPARATION | [1998/41] | Entry into regional phase | 20.05.1998 | National basic fee paid | 20.05.1998 | Search fee paid | 20.05.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.05.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/41] | 11.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 28.06.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 24.08.2005 | [2006/13] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4778624 (OHASHI HIROSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-4 * column 8, line 35 - line 40; example 34 * * column 5, line 63 - column 6, line 3 * * column 3, line 30 - column 4, line 42 *; | [Y]US5226954 (SUZUKI TAKEHIRO [JP]) [Y] 1-4 * cited in the application; column 4, line 13 - column 5, line 44; claim 1; tables 1,2 * * column 9, line 33 - line 51 *; | [Y]FR1526231 (RHONE POULENC SA) [Y] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0340816 (PCR [US]) [Y] 1-4 * page 4 - page 5; claim 1 * * page 1, line 1 - line 5 * * page 1, line 35 - line 38 *; | [XD]EP0401496 (HUELS CHEMISCHE WERKE AG [DE]) [XD] 1-9 * page 3, line 7 - line 17 * * page 3, line 32 - line 36 *; | [XD]US5100955 (PONS DICK A [NL], et al) [XD] 1-9 * column 1, line 11 - line 16 * * column 1, line 37 - column 2, line 14 * * column 2, line 64 - column 3, line 33 * * column 4, line 6 - line 16; example -; claim 1 *; | [X]US4077932 (COLUMBUS PETER SPIROS) [X] 1-9 * column 2, line 11 - line 46 * * column 8, line 39 - line 54 * * column 9, line 32 - line 40; example -; claim 1 * | International search | [X]US5196054 (SCHMUCK MANFRED [US], et al); | [Y]US4716194 (WALKER JAMES L [US], et al); | [A]US5385955 (TARSHIANI YASSIN Y [US], et al) |