EP0799337 - WINDING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.12.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 07.05.2003 [2003/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MASCHINENFABRIK RIETER AG Klosterstrasse 20 Postfach 290 8406 Winterthur / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1997/41] | For all designated states MASCHINENFABRIK RIETER AG Klosterstrasse 20, Postfach 290 CH-8406 Winterthur / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIEGENTHALER, Marcel Im Grund 10 CH-8424 Embrach / CH | 02 /
SPÖRRI, Christian Im Gügi 2 CH-8457 Humlikon / CH | 03 /
GRABER, Werner Rebackerstrasse 22 CH-8810 Horgen / CH | [1997/41] | Application number, filing date | 96933299.8 | 18.10.1996 | [1997/41] | WO1996CH00366 | Priority number, date | DE19951039365 | 23.10.1995 Original published format: DE 19539365 | [1997/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9715707 | Date: | 01.05.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0799337 | Date: | 08.10.1997 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.05.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0799337 | Date: | 30.01.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.05.1997 | Classification | IPC: | D01G27/04 | [1997/41] | CPC: |
D01G27/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GR, IT, LI, PT [1997/41] | Title | German: | WICKELVORRICHTUNG | [1997/41] | English: | WINDING DEVICE | [1997/41] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ENROULEMENT | [1997/41] | Entry into regional phase | 14.06.1997 | National basic fee paid | 14.06.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.06.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.1997 | Examination requested [1997/41] | 13.09.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.06.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.09.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 24.09.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 30.01.2002 | PT | 30.04.2002 | [2003/19] |
Former [2003/06] | PT | 30.04.2002 | Cited in | International search | [XA]GB680464 (TMM RESEARCH LTD, et al) [X] 1,14,24,29 * page 2, line 19 - page 3, line 80; figures 1-5; claims 1,5,10 * [A] 9,10,13,18,29,30,34; | [A]GB398617 (GORDON FRASER, et al) [A] 1,22,23 * the whole document *; | [A]US2057191 (HUFFINE KENNETH W) [A] 1 * column 1, line 39 - column 2, line 45; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [AD]GB329871 (GORDON FRASER, et al) [AD] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE90753 (BORIOS,A.); | [A]JPH07138818 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950530), vol. 95, no. 05, & JP07138818 A 19950530 (HARA SHIYOKUKI SEISAKUSHO KK) [A] 1,23 * abstract * |