EP0852610 - PRECROSS-LINKED SILICONE ELASTOMER PARTICLES WITH ORGANOPOLYMER SHELL AS FORMULATION CONSTITUENT IN POWDER COATING MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.03.2000 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.05.2000 [2000/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wacker-Chemie GmbH Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | [1998/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GECK, Michael Einsteinstrasse 1 D-84489 Burghausen / DE | 02 /
GOEBLMEIER, Walter Dorfstrasse 18a, Rogglfing D-84329 Wurmannsquick / DE | 03 /
DEUBZER, Bernward Virchowstrasse 14 D-84489 Burghausen / DE | 04 /
PATRICK, Ekkehard Hochgernweg 1 D-84508 Burgkirchen / DE | [1998/29] | Representative(s) | Rimböck, Karl-Heinz, et al Wacker-Chemie GmbH Zentralabteilung PML Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/29] | Rimböck, Karl-Heinz, Dr., et al c/o Wacker-Chemie GmbH Zentralabteilung PML Hans-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96933401.0 | 26.09.1996 | [1998/29] | WO1996EP04208 | Priority number, date | DE1995135824 | 26.09.1995 Original published format: DE 19535824 | [1998/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9712005 | Date: | 03.04.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0852610 | Date: | 15.07.1998 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.04.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0852610 | Date: | 26.05.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.04.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C09D151/08, C08F283/12 | [1998/29] | CPC: |
C08F283/12 (EP,KR,US);
C09D151/08 (KR);
C09D5/03 (KR);
C09D5/037 (EP,US);
Y10S525/902 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1998/29] | Title | German: | VORVERNETZTE SILICONELASTOMER-PARTIKEL MIT ORGANOPOLYMERHÜLLE ALS FORMULIERUNGSBESTANDTEIL IN PULVERLACKEN | [1998/29] | English: | PRECROSS-LINKED SILICONE ELASTOMER PARTICLES WITH ORGANOPOLYMER SHELL AS FORMULATION CONSTITUENT IN POWDER COATING MATERIALS | [1998/29] | French: | PARTICULES EN ELASTOMERE DE SILICONE PRERETICULEES POURVUES D'UNE ENVELOPPE DE POLYMERE ORGANIQUE, UTILISEES COMME CONSTITUANTS DE FORMULATION DANS DES PEINTURES EN POUDRE | [1998/29] | Entry into regional phase | 19.03.1998 | National basic fee paid | 19.03.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.03.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.03.1998 | Examination requested [1998/29] | 19.03.1998 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 11.08.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.08.1998 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 27.11.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.01.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 28.01.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.02.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0217257 (BAYER AG [DE]) [X] 1* the whole document *; | [AD]EP0275051 (GLIDDEN CO [US]) [AD] 1 * the whole document * |