EP0857111 - Sheet laminate comprising a protective film releasably attached to a substrate by a radiation cured adhesive layer and another protective film attached to the other surface of the substrate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1998/33] | METHOD OF PROTECTING THE SURFACE OF A FOIL, RELEASABLY ADHERING PROTECTIVE FILM AND FILM-COATED FOIL | ||
[2002/29] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.12.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.02.2004 [2004/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Metallized Products Inc. 37 East Street Winchester, MA 10890 / US | [1998/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILHEIM, Martin, J. 17 Woodbine Avenue Larchmont, NY 10538 / US | 02 /
KEOUGH, Allen, H. 3 Elizabeth Drive Northborough, MA 01532 / US | [1998/33] | Representative(s) | Allsop, John Rowland MacLeod Allsop Wellington House 57 Dyer Street Cirencester, Glos GL7 2PP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/42] | Allsop, John Rowland MacLeod & Co., Bledington Grounds Bledington, Gloucestershire OX7 6XL / GB | ||
Former [1998/33] | Allsop, John Rowland MacLeod & Co., Bledington Grounds Bledington, Gloucestershire 0X7 6XL / GB | Application number, filing date | 96933583.5 | 25.10.1996 | [1998/33] | WO1996IB01151 | Priority number, date | US19950548492 | 26.10.1995 Original published format: US 548492 | [1998/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9715446 | Date: | 01.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0857111 | Date: | 12.08.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.05.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0857111 | Date: | 12.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.05.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B32B31/12 | [1998/33] | CPC: |
B32B37/0038 (EP);
B32B37/26 (EP);
H05K3/022 (EP);
B32B2309/02 (EP);
B32B2309/12 (EP);
B32B2310/0887 (EP);
B32B2311/12 (EP);
B32B2367/00 (EP);
B32B2457/08 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1998/33] | Title | German: | Folienlaminat mit abziehbarem, mittels einer durch Bestrahlung vernetzten Klebschicht an einem Substrat haftenden Schutzfilm und einem anderen Schutzfilm, an der anderen Substratoberfläche verbunden | [2002/29] | English: | Sheet laminate comprising a protective film releasably attached to a substrate by a radiation cured adhesive layer and another protective film attached to the other surface of the substrate | [2002/29] | French: | Laminé en forme de feuille comprenant un film protecteur détachable attaché à un substrat au moyen d'une couche adhésive radio-réticulée ainsi qu'un autre film protecteur attaché à l'autre face du substrat | [2002/29] |
Former [1998/33] | VERFAHREN ZUM SCHÜTZEN EINER FOLIENOBERFLÄCHE,HAFTENDER UND ABZIEHBARER SCHUTZFILM UND FOLIE BESCHICHTET MIT EINEM FILM | ||
Former [1998/33] | METHOD OF PROTECTING THE SURFACE OF A FOIL, RELEASABLY ADHERING PROTECTIVE FILM AND FILM-COATED FOIL | ||
Former [1998/33] | PROCEDE DE PROTECTION DE LA SURFACE D'UN FEUIL, FILM PROTECTEUR ADHERANT DE MANIERE DETACHABLE ET FEUIL RECOUVERT D'UN FILM | Entry into regional phase | 26.05.1998 | National basic fee paid | 26.05.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.05.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.05.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/33] | 11.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.12.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.03.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 23.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 23.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.11.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/06] | Request for further processing for: | 20.11.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 23.11.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.12.2002 | Decision despatched | 08.03.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 15.03.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.05.2002 | Decision despatched | 24.12.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 24.12.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.01.2000 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.11.1999 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   12.11.1999 | 31.10.2001 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   28.11.2001 | 31.10.2002 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   27.11.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [PXL]WO9601605 (WILHEIM MARTIN ;KEOUGH ALLEN H (US)) [PXL] 1-38 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0535868 (GOULD INC) [A] 1,10,13,14,18,23,31,34 * column 2, line 47 - column 3, line 30 * * column 4, line 16 - line 19 * * column 6, line 53 - column 7, line 25 * * figure - *; | [A]US5413838 (AZUMA KEIJI ET AL) [A] 1,10,13,14,18,23,31,34 * column 2, line 54 - column 4, line 3; figure 1 *; | [DA]US5120590 (SAVAGE ROLLAND D ET AL) [DA] 1,10,13,14,18,23,31,34 * column 2, line 40 - column 5, line 2 * * figure - * |