EP0879334 - LOCKING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.02.2000 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.2000 | Supplementary search report | published on 05.04.2000 [2000/14] | 18.02.2000 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.04.2000 [2000/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mul-T-Lock Technologies Ltd. Mul-T-Lock Park, P.O. Box 465 81550 Yavne / IL | [1998/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHARNLEY, John 178-180 Newton Road High Heaton Newcastle upon Tyne NE7 7HP / GB | 02 /
McALLISTER, Dion 14 Harding Close Ketering North Hants NN15 5DQ / GB | [1998/48] | Representative(s) | Ungria López, Javier, et al c/o UNGRIA Patentes y Marcas, S.A. Avda. Ramon y Cajal, 78 28043 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [1998/48] | Ungria Lopez, Javier, et al c/o UNGRIA Patentes y Marcas, S.A., Avda. Ramon y Cajal, 78 28043 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 96933595.9 | 21.10.1996 | [1998/48] | WO1996IL00129 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9715739 | Date: | 01.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/19] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0879334 | Date: | 25.11.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.05.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.09.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | E05B49/02 | [1998/48] | CPC: |
G07C9/00904 (EP);
G07C2009/00777 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/48] | Extension states | AL | 15.05.1998 | LT | 15.05.1998 | LV | 15.05.1998 | RO | 15.05.1998 | SI | 15.05.1998 | Title | German: | VERSCHLUSS-SYSTEM | [1998/48] | English: | LOCKING SYSTEM | [1998/48] | French: | SYSTEME DE VERROUILLAGE | [1998/48] | Entry into regional phase | 15.05.1998 | National basic fee paid | 15.05.1998 | Search fee paid | 15.05.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.05.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.08.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 15.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/48] | 03.02.2000 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2000/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1999 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2475220 ; | [Y]US5423198 |