EP0861150 - METHOD OF TRANSFERRING IMAGES OF BIOLOGICAL SPECIMENS ONTO LEATHER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 06.06.2012 [2012/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bryant, Terry K. Apt. 236, 718 Griffin Avenue Enumclaw, WA 98022-3462 / US | [1998/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1998/36] | Representative(s) | Perry, Robert Edward Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/36] | Perry, Robert Edward GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 96933809.4 | 18.09.1996 | [1998/36] | WO1996US14929 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9812039 | Date: | 26.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0861150 | Date: | 02.09.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.03.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0861150 | Date: | 04.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.03.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B29C59/02, C14B1/00, B41M3/00, B44C1/24 | [2001/18] | CPC: |
B41M3/00 (EP);
B44C1/24 (EP);
B44C5/06 (EP);
C14B1/56 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1998/36] | B29C59/02, C14B1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/36] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ÜBERTRAGEN VON BILDERN VON BIOLOGISCHEN PROBEN AUF LEDER | [1998/36] | English: | METHOD OF TRANSFERRING IMAGES OF BIOLOGICAL SPECIMENS ONTO LEATHER | [1998/36] | French: | PROCEDE DE TRANSFERT D'IMAGES DE SPECIMENS BIOLOGIQUES SUR DU CUIR | [1998/36] | Entry into regional phase | 12.06.1998 | National basic fee paid | 12.06.1998 | Search fee paid | 12.06.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.09.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.06.1998 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.09.1998 | Examination requested [1998/46] | 06.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]US1175998 (SHAW FRED H [US]); | [Y]US1470535 (ANTHONY KOLB FRED); | [Y]US3298881 (HIGLEY GEORGE A, et al); | [A]US3769114 (WEIGERT F); | [A]US3917786 (WEIGERT FRANZ); | [Y]US4073853 (CHESTNOV ROBERT E); | [Y]US4864790 (LIARDET ANDRE [US]); | [A]US4971743 (LANG STEFAN [CA]); | [A]US5116562 (LANG STEFAN [CA]); | [A]US5182063 (LANG STEFAN [CA], et al) |