EP0858634 - AN APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR REDUCING POWER CONSUMPTION THROUGH BOTH VOLTAGE AND FREQUENCY SCALING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.05.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.07.2004 [2004/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/34] | For all designated states INTEL CORPORATION 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95052 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REINHARDT, Dennis 3440 Kenneth Drive Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | 02 /
BHAT, Ketan 1555 W. Middlefield G5 Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 03 /
JACKSON, Robert, T. 419-15 Camille Circle San Jose, CA 95134 / US | 04 /
SENYK, Borys 1020 Polk Lane San Jose, CA 95117 / US | 05 /
MATTER, Eugene, P. 103 Big Valley Court Folsom, CA 95630 / US | 06 /
GUNTHER, Stephen, H. 103 Mannock Court Folsom, CA 95630 / US | [1998/34] | Representative(s) | Wombwell, Francis Forresters 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/34] | Wombwell, Francis Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside L41 6BR / GB | Application number, filing date | 96933920.9 | 26.09.1996 | [1998/34] | WO1996US15485 | Priority number, date | US19950537146 | 29.09.1995 Original published format: US 537146 | [1998/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9712329 | Date: | 03.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0858634 | Date: | 19.08.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.04.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0858634 | Date: | 16.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.04.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/32, G06F1/20 | [1999/34] | CPC: |
G06F9/30083 (EP,US);
G06F1/206 (EP,US);
G06F1/3203 (EP,US);
G06F1/324 (EP,US);
G06F1/3296 (EP,US);
G06F9/30076 (EP,US);
G06F9/30185 (EP,US);
H02J9/005 (EP,US);
Y02B70/30 (EP);
|
Former IPC [1998/34] | G06F15/177 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1998/34] | Title | German: | APPARAT UND VERFAHREN ZUM REDUZIEREN DES STROMVERBRAUCHS DURCH SKALIERUNG VON SPANNUNG UND FREQUENZ | [1998/34] | English: | AN APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR REDUCING POWER CONSUMPTION THROUGH BOTH VOLTAGE AND FREQUENCY SCALING | [1998/34] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE REDUIRE LA CONSOMMATION D'ENERGIE PAR ECHELONNAGE DE TENSION ET DE FREQUENCE | [1998/34] | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.1998 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.1998 | Search fee paid | 28.04.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: No | 15.04.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 28.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/34] | 08.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.11.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.2001 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 27.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.04.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 07.04.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0539884 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [X] 1,5,14,19,20,28,32 * column 1, line 23 - line 32 * * column 2, line 40 - column 3, line 29 * * column 4, line 32 - column 5, line 12 * [Y] 2-4,6,7,10-18,21,22,24-27,29,31; | [X]EP0632360 (XEROX CORP [US]) [X] 1,5,14,19,20,28,32 * column 3, line 44 - column 6, line 4 *; | [A]EP0566395 (DIA SEMICON SYSTEMS INC [JP]) [A] 2,3,10-17,24,25,29,31 * column 10, line 14 - line 58 *; | [A]EP0474963 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 30 | [YA] - "DYNAMIC POWER MANAGEMENT BY CLOCK SPEED VARIATION", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, (19900101), vol. 32, no. 8B, page 373, XP000082143 [Y] 2-4,10-18,24-27,29,31 * the whole document * [A] 8,23 | [YA] - SCHULTZ C P, "DYNAMIC CLOCK CONTROL FOR MICROPROCESSOR SYSTEM ENERGY MANAGEMENT", MOTOROLA TECHNICAL DEVELOPMENTS, (19911201), vol. 14, pages 53 - 54, XP000276157 [Y] 6,7,21,22,24-27 * the whole document * [A] 9,23 | International search | [X]US5254992 (KEEN HARRY J [US], et al) |