EP0853815 - FORMATION OF SOURCE/DRAIN FROM DOPED GLASS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.02.2001 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.03.2001 [2001/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/30] | For all designated states INTEL CORPORATION 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95052 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THOMPSON, Scott, E. 19635 N.W. Rock Creek Way Portland, OR 97229 / US | 02 /
JAN, Chia-Hong 5200 N.E. Elam Young Parkway Hillsboro, OR 97124 / US | 03 /
PACKAN, Paul, A. 15025 S.W. Gibraltar Court Beaverton, OR 97007 / US | 04 /
GHANI, Tahir 5200 N.E. Elam Young Parkway Hillsboro, OR 97124 / US | 05 /
ANDIDEH, Ebrahim 5200 N.E. Elam Young Parkway Hillsboro, OR 97124 / US | 06 /
MOGHADAM, Farhad, K. 276 Old Adobe Road Los Gatos, CA 95030 / US | 07 /
BOHR, Mark, T. 19475 S.W. Suncrest Aloha, OR 97007 / US | [1998/30] | Representative(s) | Wombwell, Francis Forresters 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/30] | Wombwell, Francis Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside L41 6BR / GB | Application number, filing date | 96934065.2 | 03.10.1996 | [1998/30] | WO1996US16002 | Priority number, date | US19950538846 | 04.10.1995 Original published format: US 538846 | [1998/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9713273 | Date: | 10.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0853815 | Date: | 22.07.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.04.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.04.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/225, H01L21/336, H01L21/8238 | [1999/43] | CPC: |
H01L29/6659 (EP);
H01L21/385 (KR);
H01L21/2255 (EP);
H01L21/823814 (EP);
H01L29/6656 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1998/30] | H01L21/385, H01L21/8232 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE, IT [1998/30] | Title | German: | BILDUNG VON SOURCE/DRAIN MIT CLOTIERTEM GLAS | [1998/30] | English: | FORMATION OF SOURCE/DRAIN FROM DOPED GLASS | [1998/30] | French: | FORMATION D'UNE REGION DE SOURCE ET DE DRAIN EN VERRE DOPE | [1998/30] | Entry into regional phase | 01.05.1998 | National basic fee paid | 01.05.1998 | Search fee paid | 01.05.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.05.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 01.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/30] | 14.04.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/12] | 26.09.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2001/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2000 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4209350 (HO IRVING T [US], et al) [X] 1,4,5 * column 6, line 65 - column 7, line 11; figures 2C,D *; | [X]US4546535 (SHEPARD JOSEPH F [US]) [X] 1,2,4-7,9-14 * column 6, line 3 - column 7, line 6; figures 1,4,5 *; | [A]US5324686 (TSUNASHIMA YOSHITAKA [JP]) [A] 1-21* column 5, lines 44-55, column 6, lines 23-26, column 7, lines 1-21, figures 3,5 *; | [E]WO9702594 (INTEL CORP [US], et al) [E] 1,4-6,10,13 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US3600797 (BOWER ROBERT W, et al); | [Y]US4102715 (KAMBARA GINJIRO, et al); | [X]US4204894 (KOMEDA TADAO [JP], et al); | [X]JPS62266829 (SHARP KK); | [Y]US5094984 (LIU CHARLES C [US], et al); | [Y]US5348900 (AYUKAWA AKITSU [JP], et al); | [XP]US5518945 (BRACCHITTA JOHN A [US], et al) | [Y] - RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, June 1988, Number 290, 29097, Kenneth Mason Publication Ltd, England, "Self-Aligning Dopinng Process Using Oxidized Dopants". |