EP0857050 - PERFORATED FILMS CAPABLE OF SPONTANEOUS FLUID INVERSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.03.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.05.2003 [2003/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clemson University Research Foundation P.O. Box 946 Clemson, SC 29633-0946 / US | [2001/48] |
Former [1998/33] | For all designated states EASTMAN CHEMICAL COMPANY 100 North Eastman Road Kingsport, TN 37660 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PHILLIPS, Bobby, Mal 352 A. A. Deakins Road Jonesborough, TN 37659 / US | [1998/33] | Representative(s) | Wibbelmann, Jobst Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/33] | Wibbelmann, Jobst, Dr., Dipl.-Chem. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96934154.4 | 11.10.1996 | [1998/33] | WO1996US16248 | Priority number, date | US19950545450 | 19.10.1995 Original published format: US 545450 | [1998/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9714388 | Date: | 24.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0857050 | Date: | 12.08.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.04.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0857050 | Date: | 22.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.04.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/15 | [1998/33] | CPC: |
A61F13/512 (EP,US);
A61F13/51108 (EP,US);
A61F13/51311 (EP,US);
A61F13/537 (EP,US);
Y10S428/913 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24273 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24281 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24298 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24322 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24802 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1998/33] | Title | German: | PERFORIERTE FILME MIT DER FÄHIGKEIT FLÜSSIGKEITEN SPONTAN DURCHZULASSEN | [1998/33] | English: | PERFORATED FILMS CAPABLE OF SPONTANEOUS FLUID INVERSION | [1998/33] | French: | FILMS PERFORES A INVERSION SPONTANEE DU FLUIDE | [1998/33] | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.1998 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.03.1998 | Examination requested [1998/33] | 25.06.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.12.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.07.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.09.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.12.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 10.12.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP01121635.5 / EP1159944 | Opposition(s) | 25.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XP]EP0689819 (UNI CHARM CORP [JP]) [XP] 1-3,5,7,8,10 * the whole document *; | [YA]EP0304617 (KAO CORP [JP]) [Y] 11,12,11,12 * page 3, line 19 - page 5, line 25 * * page 6, line 22 - line 41 * [A] 1-3; | [X]GB2258840 (UNI CHARM CORP [JP]) [X] 1-3,5 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]WO9422408 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1 * page 14, line 26 - page 15, line 34 *; | [A]EP0587118 (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND [JP], et al) [A] 1 * claims 4-6 *; | [A]GB2158721 (MOELNLYCKE AB) [A] 1 * the whole document * |