EP0876531 - RECYCLABLE FLOOR COVERING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.08.2002 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WPT Witex Polymertechnologie GmbH Charles-Lindbergh-Ring 1 32756 Detmold / DE | [2001/35] |
Former [1998/46] | For all designated states Witex AG Nord-West-Ring 21 32832 Augustdorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RICHTER, Dieter Gördeler Strasse 18a D-33649 Bielefeld / DE | [1998/46] | Representative(s) | Meinke, Dabringhaus und Partner GbR Postfach 10 46 45 44046 Dortmund / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/46] | Patentanwälte Meinke, Dabringhaus und Partner Westenhellweg 67 44137 Dortmund / DE | Application number, filing date | 96934549.5 | 05.10.1996 | [1998/46] | WO1996EP04335 | Priority number, date | DE1995146881 | 15.12.1995 Original published format: DE 19546881 | [1998/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9722748 | Date: | 26.06.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0876531 | Date: | 11.11.1998 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0876531 | Date: | 04.10.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.06.1997 | Classification | IPC: | D06N3/14, C08G18/48, C08G18/40 | [1998/46] | CPC: |
D06N3/14 (EP);
C08G18/4018 (EP);
C08G18/4812 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/46] | Title | German: | RECYCLINGFÄHIGER BODENBELAG | [1998/46] | English: | RECYCLABLE FLOOR COVERING | [1998/46] | French: | REVETEMENT DE SOL RECYCLABLE | [1998/46] | Entry into regional phase | 02.05.1998 | National basic fee paid | 02.05.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.05.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.06.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/46] | 23.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.06.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.03.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 01.06.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 04.10.2001 | GB | 04.10.2001 | IE | 04.10.2001 | IT | 04.10.2001 | NL | 04.10.2001 | LU | 05.10.2001 | MC | 05.10.2001 | DK | 04.01.2002 | PT | 04.01.2002 | SE | 04.01.2002 | GR | 05.01.2002 | ES | 30.04.2002 | [2008/06] |
Former [2005/01] | FI | 04.10.2001 | |
GB | 04.10.2001 | ||
IE | 04.10.2001 | ||
NL | 04.10.2001 | ||
LU | 05.10.2001 | ||
MC | 05.10.2001 | ||
DK | 04.01.2002 | ||
PT | 04.01.2002 | ||
SE | 04.01.2002 | ||
GR | 05.01.2002 | ||
ES | 30.04.2002 | ||
Former [2004/39] | FI | 04.10.2001 | |
GB | 04.10.2001 | ||
IE | 04.10.2001 | ||
NL | 04.10.2001 | ||
LU | 05.10.2001 | ||
MC | 05.10.2001 | ||
DK | 04.01.2002 | ||
PT | 04.01.2002 | ||
SE | 04.01.2002 | ||
ES | 30.04.2002 | ||
Former [2004/04] | FI | 04.10.2001 | |
GB | 04.10.2001 | ||
IE | 04.10.2001 | ||
NL | 04.10.2001 | ||
MC | 05.10.2001 | ||
DK | 04.01.2002 | ||
PT | 04.01.2002 | ||
SE | 04.01.2002 | ||
ES | 30.04.2002 | ||
Former [2003/46] | FI | 04.10.2001 | |
GB | 04.10.2001 | ||
IE | 04.10.2001 | ||
NL | 04.10.2001 | ||
MC | 05.10.2001 | ||
DK | 04.01.2002 | ||
PT | 04.01.2002 | ||
SE | 04.01.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | FI | 04.10.2001 | |
GB | 04.10.2001 | ||
IE | 04.10.2001 | ||
NL | 04.10.2001 | ||
MC | 05.10.2001 | ||
PT | 04.01.2002 | ||
SE | 04.01.2002 | ||
Former [2002/48] | FI | 04.10.2001 | |
GB | 04.10.2001 | ||
IE | 04.10.2001 | ||
MC | 05.10.2001 | ||
PT | 04.01.2002 | ||
SE | 04.01.2002 | ||
Former [2002/43] | FI | 04.10.2001 | |
GB | 04.10.2001 | ||
MC | 05.10.2001 | ||
SE | 04.01.2002 | ||
Former [2002/37] | FI | 04.10.2001 | |
GB | 04.10.2001 | ||
SE | 04.01.2002 | ||
Former [2002/33] | FI | 04.10.2001 | |
SE | 04.01.2002 | ||
Former [2002/27] | SE | 04.01.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3499783 (NELSON FLOYD M, et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract *; | [A]GB1272069 (ICI LTD [GB]) [A] 1-12 * page 2, line 37 - line 86; example 1; claim 1 * * page 3, line 57 - line 94 *; | [A]DE2446214 (ELASTOGRAN GMBH) [A] 1-12 * page 2, paragraph L - page 3, paragraph 1; example 4; claim 1 * * page 4, line 13 - paragraph 3 *; | [A]DE3623789 (PELZER HELMUT [DE]) [A] 1-12* claims 1,3 * | Examination | WO9514564 |