|
25.03.2011 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.03.2011 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (proprietor) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.03.2011 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.12.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.12.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.12.2010 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.12.2010 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.12.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.11.2010 |
Request for revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.06.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.05.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.05.2010 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.05.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.05.2010 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
10.05.2010 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.12.2009 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.12.2009 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.12.2009 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.12.2009 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.01.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.01.2009 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
21 |
|
27.10.2008 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.10.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.09.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.09.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.09.2008 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.09.2008 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.09.2008 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.09.2008 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.09.2008 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.09.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
15 |
|
25.09.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
25.09.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.09.2008 |
Non-scannable object |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.03.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.03.2008 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
10 |
|
27.02.2008 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.02.2008 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.02.2008 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.02.2008 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.07.2007 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.09.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.09.2005 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
15 |
|
27.07.2005 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.07.2005 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.05.2005 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.05.2005 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.01.2005 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.12.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
27.12.2004 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
27.12.2004 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
38 |
|
27.12.2004 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
27.12.2004 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
9 |
|
23.12.2004 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
13 |
|
12.11.2004 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.11.2004 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.10.2004 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.10.2004 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.10.2004 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.08.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.08.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.08.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.08.2004 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
27 |
|
17.08.2004 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
82 |
|
17.08.2004 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
34 |
|
07.07.2004 |
Citation for the examination procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
07.07.2004 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.07.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.07.2004 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
6 |
|
29.06.2004 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.06.2004 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.06.2004 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.06.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.06.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.06.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.06.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.2004 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
09.06.2004 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.2004 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
7 |
|
08.06.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
08.06.2004 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.06.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
07.06.2004 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.06.2004 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.06.2004 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
15 |
|
11.05.2004 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.05.2004 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.05.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.02.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.12.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.12.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.2003 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.12.2003 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.12.2003 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.2003 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.2003 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.2003 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
14.08.2003 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
17 |
|
24.06.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.06.2003 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.06.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.06.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.2003 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.04.2003 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.04.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.04.2003 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.03.2003 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Opposition |
4 |
|
18.03.2003 |
Request for change of name -opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.12.2002 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.12.2002 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.2002 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.10.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.10.2002 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
30.10.2002 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
17 |
|
30.10.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
30.10.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
30.10.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
30.10.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
30.10.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
30.10.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
35 |
|
30.10.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
38 |
|
29.10.2002 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
18 |
|
29.10.2002 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
20.12.2001 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.10.2001 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.2001 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.10.2001 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.07.2001 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.07.2001 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.04.2001 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.04.2001 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.04.2001 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
57 |
|
12.01.2001 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.01.2001 |
Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.10.2000 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.04.1999 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.04.1999 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.04.1999 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.1999 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.09.1998 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.09.1998 |
Request for change of name of the applicant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.08.1998 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.08.1998 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.1998 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.06.1998 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.06.1998 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.03.1998 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
02.07.1997 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.05.1997 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
01.05.1997 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
64 |
|
01.05.1997 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
56 |