EP0854837 - FILLING OF TANKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.01.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR State(s) deleted from list of lapses: ES | published on 11.06.2008 [2008/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Petro-Man Limited Forum House, 38 Newmarket Road Cambridge CB5 8DT / GB | [1998/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARTER, Rodney Tanglewood 13 Hawthorne Avenue Sawston Cambridge CB2 4TE / GB | [1998/31] | Representative(s) | Gillam, Francis Cyril, et al SANDERSON & CO. European Patent Attorneys 34, East Stockwell Street Colchester Essex CO1 1ST / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/31] | Gillam, Francis Cyril, et al SANDERSON & CO. European Patent Attorneys 34, East Stockwell Street Colchester Essex CO1 1ST / GB | Application number, filing date | 96934986.9 | 14.10.1996 | [1998/31] | WO1996GB02506 | Priority number, date | GB19950021087 | 14.10.1995 Original published format: GB 9521087 | [1998/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9714646 | Date: | 24.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0854837 | Date: | 29.07.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.04.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0854837 | Date: | 28.02.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.04.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B67D5/01, B67D5/04, B65D88/54 | [1998/31] | CPC: |
B67D7/002 (EP,US);
B65D88/544 (EP,US);
B67D7/04 (EP,US);
Y10T137/85938 (EP,US);
Y10T137/86372 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1998/31] | Title | German: | EINFÜLLEINRICHTUNG FÜR LAGERBEHÄLTER | [1998/31] | English: | FILLING OF TANKS | [1998/31] | French: | REMPLISSAGE DE RESERVOIRS | [1998/31] | Entry into regional phase | 11.05.1998 | National basic fee paid | 11.05.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.05.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.05.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/31] | 01.02.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.08.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.07.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.11.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 28.02.2001 | [2008/24] |
Former [2002/27] | ES | 28.02.2001 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3636976 (HANSEL WILLIAM B) [A] 1,11,12* figure 5 *; | [A]US4219047 (POLLEY RICHARD B [US]) [A] 1,11,12 * figure - *; | [XA]DE4335435 (HENKEL ECOLAB GMBH & CO OHG [DE]) [X] 12,13,15 * column 1, line 21 - line 26 * * column 1, line 35 - line 36; figure - * [A] 1,11 |