EP0858707 - COMMUNICATION OF IMAGES VIA A RADIO TRANSMISSION CHANNEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1998/34] | IMAGE COMMUNICATIONS | ||
[2001/18] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.12.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.02.2004 [2004/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Inmarsat Ltd. 99 City Road London EC1Y 1AX / GB | [1999/38] |
Former [1998/34] | For all designated states INTERNATIONAL MOBILE SATELLITE ORGANIZATION 99 City Road London EC1Y 1AX / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TRACHTMAN, Eyal 24 Arden Road, Finchley London N3 3AN / GB | [1998/34] | Representative(s) | Cross, James Peter Archibald, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/34] | Cross, James Peter Archibald, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co., 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 96935164.2 | 04.11.1996 | [1998/34] | WO1996GB02695 | Priority number, date | GB19950022487 | 02.11.1995 Original published format: GB 9522487 | [1998/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9716920 | Date: | 09.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/20] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0858707 | Date: | 19.08.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.05.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0858707 | Date: | 12.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/411, H04N1/00 | [1998/34] | CPC: |
H04N1/32406 (EP,US);
H04N1/00127 (EP,US);
H04N1/32037 (EP,US);
H04N1/32122 (EP,US);
H04N1/324 (EP,US);
H04N1/32795 (EP,US);
H04N1/33307 (EP,US);
H04N1/33315 (EP,US);
H04N1/33369 (EP,US);
H04N1/4115 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3205 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3209 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3214 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3215 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3218 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3219 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3221 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3225 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3243 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3274 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3276 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1998/34] | Title | German: | ÜBERTRAGUNG VON BILDERN ÜBER EINEN RUNDFUNKKANAL | [2001/18] | English: | COMMUNICATION OF IMAGES VIA A RADIO TRANSMISSION CHANNEL | [2001/18] | French: | TRANSMISSIONS D'IMAGES PAR MOYEN D'UN CANAL RADIO | [2001/18] |
Former [1998/34] | BILDÜBERTRAGUNG | ||
Former [1998/34] | IMAGE COMMUNICATIONS | ||
Former [1998/34] | TRANSMISSIONS D'IMAGES | Entry into regional phase | 27.05.1998 | National basic fee paid | 27.05.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.05.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.05.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.04.1998 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/34] | 23.02.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 25.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 29.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 12.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP01204111.7 / EP1189423 | Opposition(s) | 13.11.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]EP0483969 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 26-28 * abstract * * column 2, line 38 - line 44 * * column 4, line 53 - column 5, line 12 * [A] 17; | [XA]GB2256558 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 17 * abstract * * page 3, line 11 - page 4, line 3 * [A] 26-28; | [XA]US5253936 (ISHIDA SHINICHI [JP]) [X] 26 * column A * [A] 27,28; | [A]US5361138 (MOTEGI CHIAKI [JP], et al) [A] 26-28* column A; figure 2; claim - *; | [X]WO9527363 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [X] 1,6,7,14-16 * abstract * * page 5, line 30 - page 6, line 22 * * page 7, line 35 - line 37 *; | [X] - "Text/Image Separation by Fax with OCR", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, NEW YORK US, (199405), vol. 37, no. 5, pages 81 - 82, XP000453088 [X] 1,6 * the whole document * | [X] - R. D. PARROTT, "Text compression using spelling dictionary", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, NEW YORK US, (198304), vol. 25, no. 11b, pages 6249 - 6250, XP002025426 [X] 1,7 * the whole document * | [X] - WONG ET AL, "Document Analysis System", IBM JOURNAL OF RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT, NEW YORK US, (198211), vol. 26, no. 6, pages 647 - 656, XP002025427 [X] 1,6,7,15 * page 649, column L, paragraph L; figure 2 * * page 652, column R, paragraph 3 * | [A] - DIMOLITSAS ET AL, "Facsimile Transmission Over Digital Satellite Land-Mobile Channels", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY, NEW YORK US, (199408), vol. 43, no. 3, pages 617 - 625, XP000466795 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/25.312813 | [X] - "Storage of the capabilities of frequently called facsimile machine", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, NEW YORK US, (199005), vol. 32, no. 12, page 34, XP000105064 [X] 26-28 * the whole document * |