EP0861113 - A DICE, A GAME BOARD AND A PLAYING DICE ASSEMBLY, AND A GAME BOARD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 16.12.2015 [2015/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Golad, Adar Scherenenkweg 16 8051 KH Hattem / NL | [1998/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1998/36] | Representative(s) | Ferguson, Alexander, et al Octrooibureau Vriesendorp & Gaade B.V. P.O. Box 266 2501 AW Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2000/37] | Ferguson, Alexander, et al Octrooibureau Vriesendorp & Gaade, P.O. Box 266 2501 AW Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [1998/36] | Seerden, Adrianus Maria Octrooibureau Vriesendorp & Gaade P.O. Box 266 2501 AW Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 96935587.4 | 01.11.1996 | [1998/36] | WO1996NL00430 | Priority number, date | NL19951001678 | 17.11.1995 Original published format: NL 1001678 | [1998/36] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9718869 | Date: | 29.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0861113 | Date: | 02.09.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.05.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0861113 | Date: | 11.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.05.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A63F9/04, A63F7/00 | [1998/36] | CPC: |
A63F9/0402 (EP,US);
A63F9/04 (KR);
A63F7/0076 (EP,US);
A63F9/0415 (EP,US);
A63F2003/00264 (EP,US);
A63F2009/0422 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/36] | Title | German: | WÜRFEL, SPIELBRETT UND WÜRFELSPIELANORDNUNG UND SPIELBRETT | [1998/36] | English: | A DICE, A GAME BOARD AND A PLAYING DICE ASSEMBLY, AND A GAME BOARD | [1998/36] | French: | DE, ENSEMBLE CONSTITUE D'UN PLATEAU DE JEU ET DE DES A JOUER, ET PLATEAU DE JEU | [1998/36] | Entry into regional phase | 15.05.1998 | Translation filed | 15.05.1998 | National basic fee paid | 15.05.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.05.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.04.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.05.1998 | Examination requested [2000/16] | 09.02.2000 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 30.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.2000 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 04.07.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.10.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 27.11.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 11.04.2001 | DK | 11.07.2001 | PT | 11.07.2001 | GR | 13.07.2001 | IE | 01.11.2001 | LU | 01.11.2001 | MC | 01.11.2001 | [2015/51] |
Former [2005/01] | FI | 11.04.2001 | |
DK | 11.07.2001 | ||
PT | 11.07.2001 | ||
GR | 13.07.2001 | ||
IE | 01.11.2001 | ||
LU | 01.11.2001 | ||
MC | 01.11.2001 | ||
Former [2004/42] | FI | 11.04.2001 | |
DK | 11.07.2001 | ||
PT | 11.07.2001 | ||
IE | 01.11.2001 | ||
LU | 01.11.2001 | ||
MC | 01.11.2001 | ||
Former [2004/39] | FI | 11.04.2001 | |
DK | 11.07.2001 | ||
PT | 11.07.2001 | ||
LU | 01.11.2001 | ||
MC | 01.11.2001 | ||
Former [2003/46] | FI | 11.04.2001 | |
DK | 11.07.2001 | ||
PT | 11.07.2001 | ||
MC | 01.11.2001 | ||
Former [2002/43] | FI | 11.04.2001 | |
PT | 11.07.2001 | ||
MC | 01.11.2001 | ||
Former [2002/27] | FI | 11.04.2001 | |
PT | 11.07.2001 | ||
Former [2002/15] | FI | 11.04.2001 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3198523 (STIMSON JONATHAN C) [A] 1,2 * column W *; | [XA]CH418935 (SHARP OLEN D [US]) [X] 11 * figure 4 *[A] 7,12-14; | [A]CH511042 (GALLI ERICH [CH]) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]US3954269 (BRITTINGHAM VERTNER DAVID) [A] 1,2 * column W *; | [A]US4345761 (CHINA DAVID B) [A] 1 * column W *; | [A]GB2144999 (PIPER KEVIN GRANT) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]US5018738 (PADI GYULA [US]) [A] 1,2 * column W *; | [A]US5114147 (FAYLO JOHN [US]) [A] 5 * column A * |