EP0880708 - I/O TOGGLE TEST METHOD USING JTAG [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.07.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.08.2003 [2003/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Paldal-gu Suwon-City, Kyungki-do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/49] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-city, Kyungki-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOTE, L., Randall, Jr. 26152 Corral Road Laguna Hills, CA 92653 / US | [1998/49] | Representative(s) | Musker, David Charles, et al RGC Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/49] | Musker, David Charles, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 96935890.2 | 26.09.1996 | [1998/49] | WO1996US15151 | Priority number, date | US19960596043 | 06.02.1996 Original published format: US 596043 | [1998/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9729382 | Date: | 14.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0880708 | Date: | 02.12.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.08.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0880708 | Date: | 28.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.08.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/28, G01R31/3185 | [1999/41] | CPC: |
G01R31/318547 (EP,US);
G01R31/28 (KR)
|
Former IPC [1998/49] | G01R31/28 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1998/49] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR PRÜFUNG DES EIN-/AUSSCHALTVERHALTENS UNTER ANWENDUNG VON JTAG | [1998/49] | English: | I/O TOGGLE TEST METHOD USING JTAG | [1998/49] | French: | PROCEDE DE CONTROLE DE BASCULEMENT E/S AU MOYEN D'UNE NORME JTAG | [1998/49] | Entry into regional phase | 24.06.1998 | National basic fee paid | 24.06.1998 | Search fee paid | 24.06.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.06.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.06.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 24.06.1998 | Examination requested [1998/49] | 23.02.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0358376 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [X] 1-6 * column 2, line 19 - line 54; figures 2,4B * * column 7, line 39 - line 53 *; | [A]US5450415 (KAMADA TAKEHIRO [JP]) [A] 1-6 * column 3, line 21 - line 25 ** column 5, line 65 - line 68 * | International search | [Y]US5056094 (WHETSEL LEE D [US]); | [A]US5416784 (JOHNSON PETER A [US]); | [YP]US5495487 (WHETSEL JR LEE D [US]) |