EP0876453 - LIQUID LAUNDRY DETERGENTS CONTAINING SELECTED ALKYL AMIDOALKOYL QUATERNARY AMMONIUM COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.11.2001 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.11.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.12.2001 [2001/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/46] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RANDALL, Sherri, L. 6841 Stone Valley Court Hamilton, OH 45011 / US | 02 /
SIVIK, Mark, R. Apartment F,40 Clubhouse Lane Fairfield, OH 45014 / US | 03 /
HARTMAN, Frederick, Anthony 10347 Deerfield Road Cincinnati, OH 45242 / US | [1998/46] | Representative(s) | Engisch, Gautier NV Procter & Gamble Services Company SA IP Patent Department Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/46] | Engisch, Gautier Procter & Gamble European Technical Center N.V. Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | Application number, filing date | 96936038.7 | 27.09.1996 | [1998/46] | WO1996US15578 | Priority number, date | US19950604546 | 29.09.1995 Original published format: US 604546 | [1998/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9712020 | Date: | 03.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0876453 | Date: | 11.11.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.04.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.04.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C11D1/65, C11D1/86 | [1998/46] | CPC: |
C11D1/86 (EP);
C11D1/65 (EP);
C11D1/146 (EP);
C11D1/29 (EP);
C11D1/525 (EP);
C11D1/62 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1998/46] | Title | German: | QUARTÄRE ALKYLAMIDOADOALKOYLAMMONIUMVERBINDUNGEN ENTHALTENDE FLÜSSIGE WASCHMITTEL | [1998/46] | English: | LIQUID LAUNDRY DETERGENTS CONTAINING SELECTED ALKYL AMIDOALKOYL QUATERNARY AMMONIUM COMPOUNDS | [1998/46] | French: | DETERGENTS LIQUIDES POUR LESSIVE, CONTENANT DES COMPOSES D'AMMONIUM QUATERNAIRE AMIDOALCOYLE ALKYLE SELECTIONNES | [1998/46] | Entry into regional phase | 14.02.1998 | National basic fee paid | 14.02.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.02.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.04.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.02.1998 | Examination requested [1998/46] | 20.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.05.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/51] | 10.07.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2001/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4239631 (BROWN HERMAN) [X] 1,3 * column 3, line 10 - line 20; examples 4,8; claims 1-14 *; | [X]US5145607 (RICH ARTHUR G) [X] 1 * column 5, line 14 - line 46; claims 1,11 *; | [A]EP0440229 (SHEREX CHEM) [A] 1,2 * page 6, line 12 - line 25 * * page 7, line 34 - line 52; claims 1-15 *; | [A]FR2329746 (PROCTER & GAMBLE EUROP) [A] * claim 1 *; | [A]GB2204609 (SANDOZ LTD) [A] * claims 1-4,11 * |