EP0855010 - MINIATURE MIXED GAS REFRIGERATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.03.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.05.2003 [2003/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cryogen, Inc. Suite 106, 6199 Cornerstone Court E. San Diego, CA 92121 / US | For all designated states THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, represented by the Secretary, United States Department of Commerce National Institute of Standards & Technology, Room B-256, Physics Building Gaithersburg, MD 20899-0001 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/31] | For all designated states Cryogen, Inc. Suite 106, 6199 Cornerstone Court E. San Diego, CA 92121 / US | ||
For all designated states THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, represented by the Secretary, United States Department of Commerce National Institute of Standards & Technology, Room B-256, Physics Building Gaithersburg, MD 20899-0001 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOBAK, John D. III 2707 Camino Del Mar Del Mar, CA 92014 / US | 02 /
RADEBAUGH, Ray 335 Gorham Court Louisville, CO 80027 / US | 03 /
HUBER, Marcia, L. 905 McKinley Avenue Louisville, CO 80027 / US | 04 /
MARQUARDT, Eric, D. 9621 West Eleventh Avenue Lakewood, CO 80215 / US | [1998/47] |
Former [1998/31] | 01 /
DOBAK, John, D., III 5574 Soledad Drive San Diego, CA 92037 / US | ||
02 /
RADEBAUGH, Ray 335 Gorham Court Louisville, CO 80027 / US | |||
03 /
HUBER, Marcia, L. 905 McKinley Avenue Louisville, CO 80027 / US | |||
04 /
MARQUARDT, Eric, D. 9621 West Eleventh Avenue Lakewood, CO 80215 / US | Representative(s) | Jacob, Reuben Ellis, et al Marks & Clerk Incorporating Edward Evans Barker Clifford's Inn Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/31] | Jacob, Reuben Ellis, et al Edward Evans & Co., Chancery House, 53-64 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1SD / GB | Application number, filing date | 96936309.2 | 09.10.1996 | [1998/31] | WO1996US16197 | Priority number, date | US19950542123 | 12.10.1995 Original published format: US 542123 | [1998/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9714005 | Date: | 17.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0855010 | Date: | 29.07.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.04.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.04.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F25B19/02, F25D3/00, A61B17/36 | [1998/31] | CPC: |
F28F13/06 (EP,US);
A61B18/02 (EP,US);
C09K5/045 (EP,US);
F25B9/006 (EP,US);
F25B9/02 (EP,US);
F28D7/12 (EP,US);
F28F21/08 (EP,US);
A61B2018/0212 (EP,US);
A61B2018/0275 (EP,US);
A61B2018/0281 (EP,US);
C09K2205/12 (EP,US);
C09K2205/122 (EP,US);
C09K2205/13 (EP,US);
C09K2205/132 (EP,US);
F25B2309/003 (EP,US);
F25B2309/021 (EP,US);
F25B2309/022 (EP,US);
F25B2309/023 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE, NL [1998/31] | Title | German: | MINIATUR-MISCHGASKÄLTESYSTEM | [1998/31] | English: | MINIATURE MIXED GAS REFRIGERATION SYSTEM | [1998/31] | French: | SYSTEME DE REFRIGERATION MINIATURE ET A MELANGE DE GAZ | [1998/31] | Entry into regional phase | 01.05.1998 | National basic fee paid | 01.05.1998 | Search fee paid | 01.05.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.05.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.05.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 01.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/31] | 17.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.10.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/19] | 03.12.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 04.06.1998 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   05.06.1998 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]FR2477406 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]); | [Y]US5101894 (HENDRICKS JOHN B [US]); | [Y]US5337572 (LONGSWORTH RALPH C [US]); | [Y]US5365750 (GREENTHAL STEVEN [US]) |