EP0861154 - IMAGE-RECEPTIVE COATING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.02.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, WI 54956 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC. 401 North Lake Street Neenah WI 54956 / US | ||
Former [2002/16] | For all designated states Kimberly-Clark Worldwide, Inc. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, WI 54956 / US | ||
Former [1998/36] | For all designated states Kimberly-Clark Worldwide, Inc. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, WI 54957-0349 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRONZER, Francis, Joseph 4217 North Mountain Road Marietta, GA 30066 / US | [1998/36] | Representative(s) | Diehl, Hermann O. Th., et al Diehl & Partner GbR Augustenstrasse 46 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/36] | Diehl, Hermann, Dr. Dipl.-Phys., et al DIEHL, GLÄSER, HILTL & PARTNER Patentanwälte Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96936371.2 | 11.10.1996 | [1998/36] | WO1996US16294 | Priority number, date | US19950557983 | 13.11.1995 Original published format: US 557983 | [1998/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9718090 | Date: | 22.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0861154 | Date: | 02.09.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0861154 | Date: | 17.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.05.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/00, B41M5/035, C09D7/12, C09D201/00, C09D125/06, C09D177/00, C09D123/04 | [1998/36] | CPC: |
B41M5/52 (EP,US);
B41M7/0027 (EP,US);
B41M7/009 (EP,US);
C09D125/06 (EP,US);
C09D201/00 (EP,US);
B41M5/508 (EP,US);
B41M5/5227 (EP,US);
C08L33/06 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24893 (EP,US);
Y10T428/254 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C09D125/06, C08L2666/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1998/36] | Title | German: | BILDEMPFANGBESCHICHTUNG | [2001/33] | English: | IMAGE-RECEPTIVE COATING | [1998/36] | French: | REVETEMENT DE SUPPORT D'IMAGE | [1998/36] |
Former [1998/36] | BILDEMPFANGSBESCHICHTTUNG | Entry into regional phase | 04.06.1998 | National basic fee paid | 04.06.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.06.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.05.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 04.06.1998 | Examination requested [1998/36] | 17.08.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.10.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 12.06.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 02.07.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 01.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 28.12.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Opposition(s) | 20.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XD]US5242739 (KRONZER FRANCES J [US], et al) [XD] 1-14 * column 3, line 45 - column 4, line 29 * * claim 1 *; | [X]EP0587164 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1-14 * page 4, line 47 - line 51 * * page 5, line 45 - line 55 * * page 6, line 5 - line 24 * * page 8, line 14 - line 25 * * figures 1,2; example 1; claims 1-3 *; | [X]WO9304869 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [X] 1-14 * page 4, line 15 - page 5, line 7 * * page 14, line 9 - page 15, line 24 * * claims 1,6-9,11 *; | [X]JPH04265784 ; | [A]GB2189436 (OLIVEIRA AMANDA UCHOA D) [A] 15-23 * claims 1,2,7 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930204), vol. 17, no. 56, Database accession no. (M - 1362), & JP04265784 A 19920921 (MITSUBISHI KASEI CORPORATION) [X] 1-14 * abstract * |