EP0855012 - METHOD FOR SHIPPING CARGO REQUIRING VENTILATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Van, Jerry 630 South Oaks Avenue Ontario, CA 91762 / US | [1998/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1998/31] | Representative(s) | WP Thompson 8th Floor 1 Mann Island Liverpool L3 1BP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/31] | W.P. Thompson & Co. Coopers Building, Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | Application number, filing date | 96936447.0 | 10.10.1996 | [1998/31] | WO1996US16407 | Priority number, date | US19950542989 | 13.10.1995 Original published format: US 542989 | [1998/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9714007 | Date: | 17.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0855012 | Date: | 29.07.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.04.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0855012 | Date: | 27.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.04.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F25D17/06, B60H1/32 | [1998/31] | CPC: |
F25D17/005 (EP,US);
B60P3/20 (EP,US);
B65D57/003 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/31] | Title | German: | VERSENDUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR BELÜFTUNG BRAUCHENDE FRACHT | [1998/31] | English: | METHOD FOR SHIPPING CARGO REQUIRING VENTILATION | [1998/31] | French: | METHODE DE TRANSPORT DE CARGAISON NECESSITANT UNE VENTILATION | [1998/31] | Entry into regional phase | 13.05.1998 | National basic fee paid | 13.05.1998 | Search fee paid | 13.05.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.05.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.04.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 13.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/31] | 28.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2001 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   15.01.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.08.2003 | BE | 27.08.2003 | CH | 27.08.2003 | FI | 27.08.2003 | FR | 27.08.2003 | IT | 27.08.2003 | LI | 27.08.2003 | NL | 27.08.2003 | IE | 10.10.2003 | LU | 10.10.2003 | MC | 31.10.2003 | DK | 27.11.2003 | GB | 27.11.2003 | GR | 27.11.2003 | SE | 27.11.2003 | DE | 28.11.2003 | ES | 08.12.2003 | PT | 27.01.2004 | [2008/06] |
Former [2006/14] | AT | 27.08.2003 | |
BE | 27.08.2003 | ||
CH | 27.08.2003 | ||
FI | 27.08.2003 | ||
FR | 27.08.2003 | ||
LI | 27.08.2003 | ||
NL | 27.08.2003 | ||
IE | 10.10.2003 | ||
LU | 10.10.2003 | ||
MC | 31.10.2003 | ||
DK | 27.11.2003 | ||
GB | 27.11.2003 | ||
GR | 27.11.2003 | ||
SE | 27.11.2003 | ||
DE | 28.11.2003 | ||
ES | 08.12.2003 | ||
PT | 27.01.2004 | ||
Former [2005/03] | AT | 27.08.2003 | |
BE | 27.08.2003 | ||
CH | 27.08.2003 | ||
FI | 27.08.2003 | ||
LI | 27.08.2003 | ||
NL | 27.08.2003 | ||
IE | 10.10.2003 | ||
LU | 10.10.2003 | ||
MC | 31.10.2003 | ||
DK | 27.11.2003 | ||
GB | 27.11.2003 | ||
GR | 27.11.2003 | ||
SE | 27.11.2003 | ||
DE | 28.11.2003 | ||
ES | 08.12.2003 | ||
PT | 27.01.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 27.08.2003 | |
BE | 27.08.2003 | ||
CH | 27.08.2003 | ||
FI | 27.08.2003 | ||
LI | 27.08.2003 | ||
NL | 27.08.2003 | ||
LU | 10.10.2003 | ||
MC | 31.10.2003 | ||
DK | 27.11.2003 | ||
GB | 27.11.2003 | ||
GR | 27.11.2003 | ||
SE | 27.11.2003 | ||
DE | 28.11.2003 | ||
ES | 08.12.2003 | ||
PT | 27.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/46] | AT | 27.08.2003 | |
BE | 27.08.2003 | ||
CH | 27.08.2003 | ||
FI | 27.08.2003 | ||
LI | 27.08.2003 | ||
NL | 27.08.2003 | ||
LU | 10.10.2003 | ||
DK | 27.11.2003 | ||
GB | 27.11.2003 | ||
GR | 27.11.2003 | ||
SE | 27.11.2003 | ||
DE | 28.11.2003 | ||
ES | 08.12.2003 | ||
PT | 27.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/45] | AT | 27.08.2003 | |
BE | 27.08.2003 | ||
CH | 27.08.2003 | ||
FI | 27.08.2003 | ||
LI | 27.08.2003 | ||
NL | 27.08.2003 | ||
LU | 10.10.2003 | ||
DK | 27.11.2003 | ||
GB | 27.11.2003 | ||
GR | 27.11.2003 | ||
SE | 27.11.2003 | ||
DE | 28.11.2003 | ||
PT | 27.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 27.08.2003 | |
BE | 27.08.2003 | ||
CH | 27.08.2003 | ||
FI | 27.08.2003 | ||
LI | 27.08.2003 | ||
NL | 27.08.2003 | ||
LU | 10.10.2003 | ||
DK | 27.11.2003 | ||
GR | 27.11.2003 | ||
SE | 27.11.2003 | ||
DE | 28.11.2003 | ||
PT | 27.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/31] | AT | 27.08.2003 | |
BE | 27.08.2003 | ||
CH | 27.08.2003 | ||
FI | 27.08.2003 | ||
LI | 27.08.2003 | ||
NL | 27.08.2003 | ||
DK | 27.11.2003 | ||
GR | 27.11.2003 | ||
SE | 27.11.2003 | ||
DE | 28.11.2003 | ||
PT | 27.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/29] | AT | 27.08.2003 | |
BE | 27.08.2003 | ||
CH | 27.08.2003 | ||
FI | 27.08.2003 | ||
LI | 27.08.2003 | ||
NL | 27.08.2003 | ||
DK | 27.11.2003 | ||
GR | 27.11.2003 | ||
SE | 27.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/28] | AT | 27.08.2003 | |
BE | 27.08.2003 | ||
CH | 27.08.2003 | ||
FI | 27.08.2003 | ||
LI | 27.08.2003 | ||
NL | 27.08.2003 | ||
GR | 27.11.2003 | ||
SE | 27.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/22] | AT | 27.08.2003 | |
CH | 27.08.2003 | ||
FI | 27.08.2003 | ||
LI | 27.08.2003 | ||
NL | 27.08.2003 | ||
GR | 27.11.2003 | ||
SE | 27.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/16] | AT | 27.08.2003 | |
FI | 27.08.2003 | ||
NL | 27.08.2003 | ||
GR | 27.11.2003 | ||
SE | 27.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/14] | AT | 27.08.2003 | |
FI | 27.08.2003 | ||
NL | 27.08.2003 | ||
GR | 27.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/13] | FI | 27.08.2003 | |
NL | 27.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/12] | FI | 27.08.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3776145 (ANDERSON R, et al) [A] 1* figure 5; claim 1 * | International search | [A]US2070044 (GILPIN GARTH G); | [A]US2293316 (STEBBINS HARRY Y); | [A]US3092220 (BLACK JAMES J); | [A]US3673812 (PIERCE HAROLD C); | [A]US3961925 (RHOAD JOHN H); | [A]US4532774 (BURNS DANIEL E [US]); | [A]US4553403 (TAYLOR DAVID H [US]); | [A]US4598555 (WINDECKER ROBERT J [US]); | [A]US4936104 (HICKE GERALD E [US]); | [A]US5168717 (MOWATT-LARSSEN ERLING [US]); | [A]US5319941 (SCHILLING RICHARD L [US]) | by applicant | US5116191 |