EP0804376 - CONVEYOR BELT LIFT APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.01.2002 Database last updated on 22.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastern Associated Coal Corp. 800 Laidley Tower Charleston, WV 25324 / US | [1997/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GALLAGHER, Nelson, D. 800 Laidley Tower Charleston, WV 25324 / US | 02 /
McNEELY, Randall, R. 800 Laidley Tower Charleston, WV 25324 / US | [1997/45] | Representative(s) | Brand, Thomas Louis, et al WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Brand, Thomas Louis, et al W.P. Thompson & Co. 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | ||
Former [1997/45] | Brand, Thomas Louis, et al W.P. Thompson & Co., Celcon House, 289-293 High Holborn London WC1V 7HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 96936833.1 | 22.10.1996 | [1997/45] | WO1996US16914 | Priority number, date | US19950562269 | 22.11.1995 Original published format: US 562269 | [1997/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9719008 | Date: | 29.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0804376 | Date: | 05.11.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.05.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.05.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B65G21/10, B65G15/00 | [2001/48] | CPC: |
B65G15/08 (EP,US);
B65G15/00 (EP,US);
B65G15/60 (EP,US);
B65G2201/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/45] | B65G21/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1997/45] | Title | German: | HEBEVORRICHTUNG FÜR FÖRDERBAND | [1997/45] | English: | CONVEYOR BELT LIFT APPARATUS | [1997/45] | French: | APPAREIL DE LEVAGE POUR CONVOYEUR A BANDE | [1997/45] | Entry into regional phase | 10.07.1997 | National basic fee paid | 10.07.1997 | Search fee paid | 10.07.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.07.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/45] | 03.01.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE8525773U (RUHRKOHLE AG) [A] 1,2,4-6,8* figure -; claim - *; | [XA]AU580705B (BELLE BANNE AUST PTY LTD) [X] 1,2,4,7-10 * figure -; claim - * [A] 5,6; | [XA]DE9111377U (RUHRKOHLE AG) [X] 1-4,6,8,9 * figure -; claim - * [A] 5 | International search | [A]US4007827 (MATTOS DAVID W); | [X]US4513859 (LONG WALLACE H [US], et al); | [A]US4736835 (HINKLE DONALD L [US]); | [A]GB2207408 (DOWTY MECO LTD); | [A]US4932516 (ANDERSSON SVEN E [US]) |